Jackson et al v. State of California et al

Plaintiff: Arthur Duane Jackson, Leonard M. Lujan, Marcus Jackson, Rodney Taylor, Lacedric Johnson, L.T. Belton and Norman Johnson
Defendant: State of California, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Matthew Cate, Jeffrey Beard, P.D. Brazelton, James D. Hartley and California Correctional Health Care Services
Case Number: 1:2013cv01055
Filed: July 9, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order 135 ORDER RE Stipulation to STAY CASE Pending Appeal signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/23/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order 130 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER RE 106 Findings & Recommendations re Defendants' 89 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/28/2015. (Flores, E)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order 127 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE ADOPTING 106 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 89 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/17/15. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order 117 ORDER VACATING Scheduling Order and Setting a Further Status Conference on 8/24/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/10/2015. (Kusamura, W)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order 114 ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/1/2015. ((1) The deadline to file any objections to the Magistrates 106 Findings and Recommendations shall be 6/17/2015; (2) The objections shall be no more than 35 pages in length, excluding tables of contents and authorities; (3) The deadline to file responses to objections shall be due 7/8/2015.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order 106 Findings and Recommendations recommending Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 89 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/19/2015. Motions referred to Judge O' Neill. Objections to F&R due by 6/3/2015. (Rosales, O)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order 102 Order directing parties to file supplemental briefing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/30/2015. (Supplemental Briefing Deadline: 5/1/2015; Opposition due by 5/6/2015) (Rosales, O)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order 96 ORDER RE: STIPULATION to Continue the Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Docs. 89 , 95 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/1/2015. The Motion Hearing now set for 4/15/2015 at 10:00 AM is CONTINUED to 4/29/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Plaintiffs' opposition papers shall be filed on or before 4/15/2015. Defendants' reply papers, if any, shall be filed on or before 4/22/2015. (Arellano, S.)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order 92 ORDER Continuing Hearing for 89 MOTION for Judgment from 3/25/2015 to 4/15/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2015. (Kusamura, W)(Kusamura, W)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order 87 Joint Discovery Plan ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/5/15. (Marrujo, C)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order 85 ORDER Following Joint Discovery Plan Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/2014. (Kusamura, W)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order 83 ORDER Disregarding 82 Notice of Lodging Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures and Directing the Documents be Returned to Plaintiffs signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/03/2014. (Flores, E)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order 77 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/10/2014. (Kusamura, W)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order 73 STIPULATION and ORDER for second extension of time for defendants to file answer to second amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/16/2014. (Hernandez, M)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order 70 ORDER re Stipulation to File Response to Second Amended Complaint. Responsive pleading due 9/17/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/2/2014. (Hernandez, M)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order 68 ORDER ADOPTING 63 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/19/2014. (Flores, E)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order 67 ORDER Discharging 46 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/18/2014. (Flores, E)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 44 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation, any party may file written objections to these findings and recommen dations with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Such a document should be captioned Objections to Magistrate Judges Findings and Recommendations. The matter is referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/30/2014. (Hernandez, M)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order 54 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the hearing on 44 Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS Second Amended Complaint from 6/25/2014 to 7/9/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Plaintiff's opposition brief is due on 6/20/2014 and defendants' reply is due on 7/2/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2014. (Hernandez, M)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order 52 ORDER for Counsel to Meet and Confer Re Rule 26(f) Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/29/2014. Telephonic Hearing set for 7/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order 47 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE RE Consolidation for all Pretrial Purposes of Related Cases signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/7/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order 41 ORDER ADOPTING 38 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/10/2014. (Flores, E)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending granting in part and denying in part 25 DEFENDANT'S MOTION to DISMISS referred to District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/20/2014. (Hernandez, M)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order 31 REVISED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The 25 MOTION to DISMISS is reset for hearing from 1/15/2014 to 2/19/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Plaintiff's opposition brief shall be due on 1/22/2014 and defendant's reply brief shall be due on 2/12/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/2/2014. (Hernandez, M)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order 24 ORDER vacating order striking amended complaint and denying defendants' motion to dismiss as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/18/2013. (Hernandez, M)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order 14 STIPULATION and ORDER extending time for defendants to file responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/17/2013. (Hernandez, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Duane Jackson
Represented By: Mike Montalban Arias
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Feldman
Represented By: J. Paul Gignac
Represented By: Mark A. Ozzello
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard M. Lujan
Represented By: Mike Montalban Arias
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Feldman
Represented By: J. Paul Gignac
Represented By: Mark A. Ozzello
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Jackson
Represented By: Mike Montalban Arias
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Feldman
Represented By: J. Paul Gignac
Represented By: Mark A. Ozzello
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Taylor
Represented By: Mike Montalban Arias
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Feldman
Represented By: J. Paul Gignac
Represented By: Mark A. Ozzello
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacedric Johnson
Represented By: Mike Montalban Arias
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Feldman
Represented By: J. Paul Gignac
Represented By: Mark A. Ozzello
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.T. Belton
Represented By: Mike Montalban Arias
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Feldman
Represented By: J. Paul Gignac
Represented By: Mark A. Ozzello
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Johnson
Represented By: Mike Montalban Arias
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Feldman
Represented By: J. Paul Gignac
Represented By: Mark A. Ozzello
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D. Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?