(PC)Mitchell v. Deptner et al
Plaintiff: James Michael Mitchell
Defendant: Deptner, Al Varezi, Anderson, D. Fisher, D. Wagner, J. Buckley, C. Tingey and D. May
Case Number: 1:2013cv01062
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Dennis L Beck
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2014 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, RTS #10 Order Dismissing Case, #11 Judgment sent to James Michael Mitchell. (Jessen, A)
June 23, 2014 Filing 11 JUDGMENT dated *6/23/2014* pursuant to #10 order. (Sant Agata, S)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to DISMISS this Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/23/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
June 23, 2014 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Dismissing Case, #11 Judgment served on James Michael Mitchell. (Sant Agata, S)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING #1 COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/23/2014. First Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form). (Jessen, A)
April 23, 2014 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on James Michael Mitchell. (Jessen, A)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/29/2013. (Jessen, A)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/29/2013. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
July 29, 2013 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on James Michael Mitchell. (Jessen, A)
July 26, 2013 Filing 6 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by James Michael Mitchell. (Marrujo, C)
July 22, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Michael Mitchell. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 19, 2013 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by James Michael Mitchell. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER To Submit Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis Or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/12/2013.(Motion for IFP due by 8/30/2013) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application & Instructions)(Fahrney, E)
July 12, 2013 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Fahrney, E)
July 12, 2013 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on James Michael Mitchell. (Fahrney, E)
July 12, 2013 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on James Michael Mitchell. (Fahrney, E)
July 11, 2013 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT (1983) against Anderson, J. Buckley, Deptner, D. Fisher, D. May, C. Tingey, Al Varezi, D. Wagner, by James Michael Mitchell.(Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Mitchell v. Deptner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deptner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Varezi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Tingey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?