Foster v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Yolanda Foster
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Case Number: 1:2013cv01188
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Judgment 25 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Defendant's 36 Request to Seal Documents In Support of it's Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Summary Adjudication, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/18/14. (Gonzalez, R)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Doc.14): Denied. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2014. (Herman, H)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Request 19 for Bank of America Party Representative to Appear by Telephone at Settlement Conference: March 27, 2014 at 9:30am in Courtroom 8, party representative shall call chambers at 559-499-5789 at the strt of the conference. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/21/2014. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Renee Cheryl Snyder Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Foster
Represented By: Russell G. VanRozeboom
Represented By: Monrae L. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?