Ledesma v. Adame et al
Plaintiff: Jose Ledesma
Defendant: Adame, J. Tyree, Lundy and K. Holland
Case Number: 1:2013cv01227
Filed: August 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Close the Case 87 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/14/2019. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE and ORDER That Plaintiff, Jose Ledesma, CDC #V-87318, in no Longer Needed in These Proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged 81 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/10/2019. (Hellings, J)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Jose Ledesma, CDC #V-87318 at January 10, 2019, 10:00 a.m., Courtroom #7, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/6/2018. (Hellings, J)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/1/2018. Settlement Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Sant Agata, S)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER and ORDER Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Copy of This Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/24/2018: Initial Disclosures: Completed; Nonexpert Discovery Cutoff: May 25, 2019; Nonexpert Discovery Cutoff: May 25, 2019; Expert DisclosureDeadline: June 28, 2019; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure: July 26, 2019; Expert Discovery Cutoff: August 23, 2019; Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: September 20, 2019; Settlement Conf.: Will be Set in a Separate Order; Status Conf: Date: April 29, 2019 Time: 10:00 a.m. Dept:10; Pretrial Conf.: Date: June 11, 2020 Time: 10:00 a.m. Dept: 2; Jury Trial: Date: August 11, 2020 Time: 8:30 a.m. Dept: 2. (Hellings, J)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Approving Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Parties to Exchange Initial Disclosures 73 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/24/2018: Initial Disclosures deadline EXTENDED to 10/15/2018. (Hellings, J)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 59 , 66 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/22/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendants' 59 Motion to Dismiss be Granted In Part and Denied In Part, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/22/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time for Plaintiff's opposition and Defendants' reply to Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's third amended complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/2/2018. Opposition due by 1/25/2018; Reply due by 2/18/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 30 , 51 & 52 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/21/2017: This case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings; 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendants' 30 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied Based on Disputes of Fact, That Defendants' 51 Motion to Strike be Denied as Moot, and Finding That Plaintiff Exhausted His Available Administrative Remedies Based on Evidence Presented at Albino Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/15/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Ten Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing and Opening Discovery only on the Issue of Exhaustion signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/04/2017. Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Flores, E)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE Regarding Setting of an Evidentiary Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/18/2017. Telephonic Conference set for 5/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Sant Agata, S)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER adopting 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/20/2017. Defendant, K. Holland is dismissed. (Lundstrom, T)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that All Other Claims and Defendants be DISMISSED From This Action With Prejudice re 23 Third Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/4/2016. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Entered on June 24, 2016; ORDER for Clerk to File Third Amended Complaint Lodged July 24, 2016, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/15/16. (Verduzco, M)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's 15 Second Amended Complaint Proceed Only Against Defendants Adame, Tyree, and Lundy for Eighth Amendment Violation Based on Conditions of Confinement, and All Remaining Claims and Defendants be Dismissed with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/24/16. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING 16 Motion for Immediate Initiation of Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/11/15. (Marrujo, C)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit New, Completed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee, within 30 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/15/13. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledesma v. Adame et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Tyree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?