Werner v. Advance Newhouse Partnership, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Werner
Defendant: Brighthouse Networks and Advance Newhouse Partnership, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv01259
Filed: August 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING the ACTION, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/28/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT re 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/27/2014. (Hall, S)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Adopting 12 Findings and Recommendation Dismissing Plaintiff's Claim for Retaliation in Violation of Title VII, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/6/14. (Verduzco, M)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to the Clerk to FILE the 11 Lodged Third Amended Complaint; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing Plaintiff's Claim for Retaliation in Violation of Title VII; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue Summons signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/16/2013. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen Days. (Sant Agata, S)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ; DENYING as moot 8 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/9/2013. (Kusamura, W)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing plaintiff to file a second amended complaint or notify the court of her willingness to proceed only on claims found to be cognizable, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/7/2013. (Kusamura, W)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISCHARGING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/26/2013. (Hall, S)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/24/2013. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2013. Amended Complaint due in 30 days. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Werner v. Advance Newhouse Partnership, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brighthouse Networks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Newhouse Partnership, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?