Tina L O'Con v. John Katavich et al
Plaintiff: Tina L O'Con
Defendant: Aagon Lucas, R Nickell, T King-Eddington, Paul Pierce and John Katavich
Case Number: 1:2013cv01321
Filed: August 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/30/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/7/2014. (Jessen, A)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/29/2014. (Timken, A)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that action proceed against Defendants, Pierce, King-Eddington and Nickell for unreasonable searches and unlawful arrest, and dismissing other claims and parties without prejudice re 1 , 6 , 9 . Defendants, John Katavich and Aagon Lucas terminated. Order referring matter back to Magistrate Judge to initiate service of process signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/16/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying 7 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting the Issuance of Service Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/6/13. (Verduzco, M)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Plaintiff to Elect to Proceed Only on Cognizable Claims or Amend the Complaint within 30 Days. Within 30 days from the date of this order Plaintiff shall either a) File a statement informing the Court of Plaintiff's willingness to pr oceed only on the claim found cognizable; or b) File an amended complaint; and if Plaintiff fails to either state her willingness to proceed with the cognizable claim or file an amended complaint, the Court will recommend dismissal of all the claims, with the exception of the claims found cognizable. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/25/2013. (Timken, A)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/3/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tina L O'Con v. John Katavich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aagon Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Nickell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T King-Eddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Katavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina L O'Con
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?