Infinity v. Ho et al
Plaintiff: Infinity
Defendant: County of Fresno Board of Supervisors, Brazelton and Chen Ho
Case Number: 1:2013cv01331
Filed: August 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request To Dismiss Action Without Prejudice (ECF No. 22 ), Clerk Shall Close The Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/30/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and ORDER DENYING 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/20/2013. Amended Complaint due within sixty (60) days. (Jessen, A)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:13-cv-1703 AC) to Fresno (1:13-cv-1331 MJS) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/21/13. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infinity v. Ho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infinity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?