Anglin v. Alrowhany
Plaintiff: Debra Anglin
Defendant: Hifdhuulah A. Alrowhany
Case Number: 1:2013cv01357
Filed: August 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/3/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING 71 Stipulation to Continue the Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/19/2017. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 7/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Updated settlement conference statements due by 6/30/2017. (Hall, S)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 68 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/2017. Settlement Conference SET for 4/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/12/2016. Consent/Decline due by 5/23/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 10/28/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 4/24/2017; Expert 6/16/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference s et for 12/12/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/30/2017; Hearing by 7/28/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/11/2017; Heari ng by 9/26/2017.Settlement Conference set for 2/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REOPEN CASE; ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 5, 2016. (Munoz, I)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CONSENT DECREE, Stipulation as to Liability and ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/13/15. (Verduzco, M)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER 38 Regarding Defendants' Financial Wherewithal and Readily Achievable Barrier Removal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/7/2015. (Hall, S)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 22 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/12/2014. (Hall, S)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISCHARGING 17 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/1/2014. (Hall, S)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Her Failure to Appear at the Scheduling Conference and Failure to Comply With the Court's Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/17/2014. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 11 Stipulation to Continue the Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/31/2014. Scheduling Conference/Status Conference set for 6/16/2014 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anglin v. Alrowhany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Anglin
Represented By: Raymond Ballister, Jr.
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Christopher Arnold Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hifdhuulah A. Alrowhany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?