Valencia v. Kokor
Plaintiff: Daniel G. Valencia
Defendant: Winfred Kokor, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01391
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying 134 Motion to Compel initial dispositional settlement documents signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/28/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER that Inmate Daniel G. Valencia is no longer needed as witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/17/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice 120 Plaintiff's Motion for the Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/16/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/7/2017. Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 09:00 AM at Corcoran State Prison before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 114 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Non-Cognizable Claims; ORDER Directing Defendants to File Responsive Pleading or Motion Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/14/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS FOR PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED ON COGNIZABLE EIGHTH AMENDMENT CLAIM FOR DAMAGES AND TO DISMISS ALL OTHER CLAIMS RE 111 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/10/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 2/27/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 112 Request for Screening, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/27/17. (Marrujo, C)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING 107 Defendants' Request for Screening signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/28/2016. (Jessen, A)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/5/2016 granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to vacate deadlines and vacating deadline for filing motions based on alleged failure to exhaust and other dispositive motions re 73 , 85 . (Lundstrom, T)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER ADOPTING 88 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER GRANTING 71 Defendant Sundaram's Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DENYING 81 Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order; and ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/7/2016. (Jessen, A)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 86 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/30/16. (Verduzco, M)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant Sundaram's Motion to Dismiss 71 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 81 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/1/16: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting Defendants' 84 Motion to Modify Discovery Scheduling Order in Part, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/11/16. (Gonzalez, R)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING 76 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/8/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 74 Motion to Stay Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/01/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER REQUIRING Defendant Kokor to File Response to Second Amended Complaint Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/14/16. (Marrujo, C)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER adopting 59 Findings and Recommendations regarding dismissal of certain claims signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/11/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/27/2015 recommending dismissal of certain claims re 54 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/20/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISCHARGING 50 Order to Show Cause; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff an Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Send Plaintiff Copies of Documents 1 , 19 , and 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/19/15. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Follow Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/31/2015. Show Cause Response due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 43 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER GRANTING 26 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint and Supplemental Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/20/2015. Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 45 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/10/2015. (Jessen, A)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF re 42 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/23/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 26 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim be GRANTED and That Plaintiff's Complaint and Supplemental Complaint be Dismissed With Leave to Amend re 19 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/11/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief be DENIED re 19 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/11/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/3/2015. (Jessen, A)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 25 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/29/2014. (Jessen, A)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/13/14. (Hellings, J)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/14/14. (Verduzco, M)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/8/2014. Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/6/2014. (Jessen, A)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/23/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencia v. Kokor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel G. Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfred Kokor, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?