Gray v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Dana Gray
Defendant: D.K. Johnson, T. Neal, R. Virk, R. Mitchell, V. Romero, John Ziomek, Cyril Rebel, Comelli and F.N.P. N. Loadholt
Case Number: 1:2013cv01473
Filed: September 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER DENYING 355 Motion for Reconsideration ; Case to Remain Closed, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/22/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Failure to Obey a Court Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/17/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER OVERRULING 324 Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate's Order Denying Motion for Appointment of an Expert; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 338 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay; ORDER DENYING 339 Plaintiff's Motion to Resume the Proceedings; ORDER DENYING 340 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint an Attorney; ORDER DENYING 341 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Directing the U.S. Marshal to Serve the Sixth Amended Complaint; and ORDER DENYING 342 Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this case proceed against Dr. Romero for inadequate medical care under the Eighth Amendment and Medical Malpractice under state law; all other claims and defendants be Dismissed, for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim re 307 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Dana Gray; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/30/2018. Objections to F&R 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER DENYING 324 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER DENYING 318 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/23/18. (Marrujo, C)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motions as Premature, Without Prejudice, to Renewal After the Court Has Completed Screening the Sixth Amended Complaint re 309 & 311 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/19/18. (Marrujo, C)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE and WARNING of requirements for opposing Defendant Rebel's Motion for Summary Judgment 309 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/5/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER DENYING 306 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/15/2018. (Jessen, A)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER DENYING 300 Motion for Stay and GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/5/2018. Sixth Amended Complaint due within forty-five (45) days. Declaration due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER Adopting 297 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER Adopting 283 Findings and Recommendations and Denying 198 Motion for Default Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/21/17. (Gonzalez, R)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Due Process Claim without Leave to Amend, Consistent with Magistrate Judge's Prior Order in Light of Williams Decision, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/13/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING Leave to File Sixth Amended Complaint, Not Exceeding 25 Pages, as Instructed by This Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/12/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions for Reconsideration 190 , 204 , 230 , 232 , 233 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/5/2017. (Jessen, A)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER denying as premature 287 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/6/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER re 284 Plaintiff's request for Status, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/27/17. (Gonzalez, R)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 198 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Rebel be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/20/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 11/6/2017.(Flores, E)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER ADOPTING 237 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER DENYING 221 Defendant Rebel's Motion to Dismiss; and ORDER DENYING 247 Defendant Rebel's Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/17/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER That Plaintiff is Authorized to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal re 277 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/12/2017. cc: Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Jessen, A)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER DENYING Requests for Judicial Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER DENYING 252 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 257 Motion to Withdraw Request; ORDER Withdrawing Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/31/2017. (Flores, E)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 160 Motion for Protective Order and 170 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 221 Defendant Rebel's Motion to Dismiss be DENIED re 45 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/6/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER Adopting 201 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and DENYING Plaintiff's 192 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, without Prejudice signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Striking 205 Fifth Amended Complaint for Excess Pages, without Leave to Amend (Motion 203 Terminated); ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/4/17. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Denying 186 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/13/2017. (Flores, E)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 192 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied, without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/13/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 5/1/2017.(Flores, E)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER DENYING 177 & 183 Motions for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/30/17. (Marrujo, C)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 182 Motion for Extension of Time and 158 ADOPTING Findings and Recommendations, GRANTING Defendant Rebel's 57 Motion to Dismiss, With Leave to Amend; GRANTING Defendant Ziomek's 122 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings With Leave to Amend; and GRANTING Defendant Mundunuri's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/27/17. (Marrujo, C)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 176 Request for Free Copies, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/17/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 166 171 172 Motions as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/2/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER DENYING 159 & 163 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery and 162 Supplement Complaint as Premature, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/3/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 57 Defendant Rebel's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED, With Leave to Amend; (2) 122 Defendant Ziomek's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings be GRANTED, With Leave to Amend, and (3 ) 122 Defendant Mundunuri's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings be GRANTED re 45 Fourth Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/18/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER RESPONDING to Plaintiff's 151 Motion of Inquiry and DENYING Request for Protective Order, without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/21/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend re 130 , 136 , 138 , 141 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/15/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING 137 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; ORDER EXTENDING Discovery Deadline and Deadline to File Dispositive Motions for All Parties, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/21/16. New Discovery Deadline: January 31, 2017; New Dispositive Motions Deadline: March 31, 2017. (Marrujo, C)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING 102 Request for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/16/16. (Marrujo, C)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order 109 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/26/16.: 30-Day Deadline (Hellings, J)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Requiring Defendants to Consent or Decline Magistrate Jurisdiction Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/12/2016. (Jessen, A)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING 110 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/9/2016. (Jessen, A)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 100 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/22/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER VACATING ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH 97 ; DENYING PLAINITIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH 81 AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DENY JUDICIAL NOTICE 91 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/8/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 81 Motion to Quash and denying 91 Motion to deny Judical Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/6/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Extending 60 Discovery and Scheduling Order to DEFENDANT ZIOMEK, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 05/26/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 73 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 05/17/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 67 Motion to Direct all Defendants to Answer Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 05/11/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Extending Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendants Loadholt, Mundunuri and Romero, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/3/16. (Verduzco, M)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 56 Motion to Supplement Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/2/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 53 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/11/16. (Marrujo, C)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER FINDING Cognizable Claims and DISMISSING Remaining Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/4/16. (Marrujo, C)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/18/2015. Amended Complaint due by 9/21/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion For Inquiry (Document 39 ), Twenty-One Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/8/2015. (Fahrney, E)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/29/2015. (Marrujo, C)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/14/15. (Gonzalez, R)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification; ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time re 34 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/13/15. Thirty-Day Amended Complaint Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Motion To Add Verification (Document 30 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/11/2015. (Fahrney, E)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion to File Amended Complaint with more than 25 pages, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/25/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/14/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.K. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Virk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ziomek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyril Rebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.N.P. N. Loadholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?