Bussiere v. Kokor et al
Plaintiff: Arthur T. Bussiere
Defendant: W. Kokor, Hashemi, Tiggs Brown, Armenta, Chang and Hunt
Case Number: 1:2013cv01565
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/19/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER VACATING 113 Amended Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/19/18. (Marrujo, C)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Requiring Defendant to Submit Formal Suggestion of Death and Proof of Service signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/04/2017. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why the action should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the court's orders 112 , 113 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/7/2017. Show Cause Response due within 21-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 09/19/2017. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 1/24/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; Plaintiff's Pretrial Statement Due by 10/27/2017. Defendants' Pretrial Statement due by 11/27/2017. Jury Trial set for 2/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Flores, E)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Produce Plaintiff Arthur T. Bussiere, CDC #K-50737 by Video Conference on July 13, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 06/21/2017. (Flores, E)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Plaintiff Arthur T. Bussiere, CDC #K-50737 on July 13, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/12/17. (Hellings, J)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/2/17. Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzalez, R)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER requiring parties to notify Court whether a Settlement Conference would be beneficial signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/5/2017. ( Filing Deadline: 5/1/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING 73 Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to the claims against Dr. Kokor and Dr. Hashemi ;ORDER ADOPTING In Part, 90 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, consistent with the above analysis; ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to the claims against Defendant Tiggs-Brown is DENIED; Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/04/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants' 73 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted in Part and Denied in Part signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/02/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/27/2017.(Flores, E)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Responsive Brief Deadline: January 11, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/16/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER for Additional Briefing, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/31/16. Deadline: 12/21/2016. (Gonzalez, R)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Adopting 62 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment, without Prejudice, on Procedural Grounds, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/25/16. Fourteen Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 37 44 52 Motions to Exceed the Interrogatory Limit of Fed.R.Civ.P.33 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/8/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants' 51 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied, Without Prejudice, on Procedural Grounds; Fifteen Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/6/2016. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 6/24/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING Defendants Leave to File Surreply signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/7/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Addressing 35 Motion for Clarification and Denying Motion to Compel and/or for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories, without Prejudice to Renewal signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/16/2015. (Flores, E)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 31 Motion to Compel as premature signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/22/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 25 Motion for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/7/2015. (Jessen, A)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Document# 20 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/5/2015. (Fahrney, E)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration and Directing Clerk's Office to Send Plaintiff Copy of Docket signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/29/2015. (Flores, E)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying Motion To Submit Exhibits And Striking Exhibits From Record (Doc. 13 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/14/2015. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussiere v. Kokor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur T. Bussiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Kokor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiggs Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?