Pitt v. Commissioner of Social Security,
Plaintiff: Barbara J. Pitt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv01596
Filed: October 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Appeal From the Administrative Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/17/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 8/12/2014 for defendant to file an answer to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/6/2014. (Rooney, M)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/9/2013. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitt v. Commissioner of Social Security,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara J. Pitt
Represented By: Vijay Jagdish Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Theophous H. Reagans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?