Griffin v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Matthew James Griffin
Defendant: A. Johnson, D Gonzales, A. Valdez, D. Smith, C. Munoz, M Sexton, M. Ross, F Thor, Kal, Busch and Bell
Case Number: 1:2013cv01599
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER of Dismissal; ORDER for Clerk of Court to Close Case (Stipulation) 184 ,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/11/17. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Adopting 164 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Defendants' 112 Motion for Sanctions, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/2/2017. (Settlement Conference (Video Conference)set for 11/14/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney, in Sacramento, CA) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Denying Motion for 30-Day Extension of Time to Object to Findings and Recommendations re 171 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/29/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant Dennis Busch's 142 Motion for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/11/17. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 125 Rule 32 Motion to Suppress Deposition Transcript and Testimony, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/7/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 120 Motion to Stay Proceedings for Fraud Upon the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/3/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs In Support of Defendants Gonzales' and Busch's Motions for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/3/17. Filing Deadline: 3/20/2017. (Marrujo, C)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER TERMINATING Defendant's 108 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status and Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 117 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status, as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Second Motion to Set the Conditions Upon Which Depositions are Conducted at the Prison 99 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/20/16. (Hellings, J)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Regarding Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Take Plaintiff's Deposition and Request for Restraints 93 ; ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Take Defendants' Depositions and Set the Conditions Upon Which Depositions are Conducted 91 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/12/16: Motion 93 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, Motion 91 is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 83 Motion for Protective Order and to Sequence Discovery; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 89 Motion for 90-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/06/2016. (Flores, E)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 82 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Matthew James Griffin signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/20/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 80 Defendants' Motion to Modify the May 5, 2016 Order Lifting Stay of Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/06/2016. (Flores, E)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's First Amended Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery 76 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Require Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents 77 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/16/16. (Hellings, J)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER lifting Stay of Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/5/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery 68 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/8/16. (Hellings, J)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS COPRUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Produce Matthew James Griffin, #1481522, via Telephonic Conference Call on May 4, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/3/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Produce Matthew James Griffin, #1481522, Via Video Conference on 05/04/16 at 9:00a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/12/16. (Gonzalez, R)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Extending Application of 48 Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendants Busch, Gonzales, Johnson and Munoz, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/8/16. (Gonzalez, R)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 34 Notice of Refusal to Copy Documents for Service of Process; ORDER to the Clerk to Make Copies signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/16/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims 26 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/26/15: Plaintiff's requests for declaratory and injunctive relief are dismissed. (Hellings, J)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/3/2015, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion/Request for Service of Complaint and Objections to Screening Order as Moot; ORDER Granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/15/2015. (Flores, E)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:13-cv-2031 CKD PC) to Fresno (1:13-cv-1599 BAM PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/4/2013. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Thor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?