Weeks v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Trevor Weeks
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv01641
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2018 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLOSING CASE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/13/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
March 27, 2018 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO INTERVENE, ORDER STRIKING MOTION, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/27/2018. (Kusamura, W)
March 23, 2018 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING DECLARATION, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/23/2018. (Kusamura, W)
March 22, 2018 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS REPORTS AND ORDER CORRECTING DOCUMENT No. 195 NUNC PRO TUNC, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2018. (Kusamura, W)
March 19, 2018 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON EX PARTE REQUETS FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/19/2018. (Kusamura, W)
March 14, 2018 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON AMENDED NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF ATTORNEY, ORDER ON EX PARTE REQUEST FOR HEARING, ORDER REINSTATING NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL, AND ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE NOTICES OF LIENS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/14/2018. (Kusamura, W)
March 9, 2018 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/9/2018. (Kusamura, W)
March 8, 2018 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT A RECEIVER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/8/2018. (Kusamura, W)
February 27, 2018 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MARCH 7, 2018 HEARING AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/27/2018. (Kusamura, W)
February 13, 2018 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO STRIKE NOTICES OF ATTORNEYS' LIENS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/13/2018. (Kusamura, W)
December 22, 2017 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PRE-TRIAL ORDER AND ORDER AMENDING PRE-TRIAL ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/22/2017. (Kusamura, W)
December 21, 2017 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/21/2017. (Kusamura, W)
July 31, 2017 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING TRIAL, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, AND PARTIAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER AND order RESETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE DATES; Pretrial Conference currently set for 8/28/2017 is moved to 12/8/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Jury Trial currently set for 11/7/2017 is moved to 1/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/31/2017. (Kusamura, W)
June 1, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.PARTIAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER setting Motions in Limine and Trial Confirmation, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/31/2017. (Kusamura, W)
May 4, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's 98 Motion for Reconsideration - A Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/22/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/3/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 21, 2017 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Pre-Trial Conference, Striking Pre-Trial Statements, and Permitting Additional Response, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/21/2017. (Kusamura, W)
February 22, 2017 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 83 Plaintiff's Motion to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/22/2017. (Hall, S)
September 20, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 77 Stipulation to Amend the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/20/2016. (Hall, S)
May 19, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/19/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Non-expert 10/3/2016; Expert 12/16/2016. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 12/30/2016; Hearing by 1/27/2017. Dispositive Motion D eadlines if allowed by Court: Filed by 12/30/2016; Hearing by 2/27/2017. Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2016 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
April 21, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 54 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/20/2016. (Kusamura, W)
February 25, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 56 Plaintiff's Motion to File an Amended Complaint; ORDER VACATING HEARING on the Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/24/2016. The motion hearing set for 2/29/2016 at 09:30 AM is VACATED. (Hall, S)
February 22, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 29, 2016 HEARING AND ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/22/2016. (Kusamura, W)
February 4, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SECOND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/4/2016. (Kusamura, W)
December 29, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court Order extending briefing schedule, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/29/2015. The deadline for filing a second summary judgment is RESET to January 11, 2016. (Rosales, O)
November 18, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Defendant's 47 Second Request to File Second Summary Judgment Motion, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/17/2015. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The parties are to continue to meet and confer as described above in good faith; 2. Defendant may file a second summary judgment motion no later than January 4, 2016; 3. Plaintiff may file an opposition within fourteen (14) days of service of the summary judgment motion; 4. Defendant may file a reply within seven (7) days of service of the opposition; and 5. The parties are to complete their meet and confer efforts as soon as possible, but no later than December 4, 2015.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 26, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding defendant's request to file a second summary judgment motion, document 44 . As soon as possible, but no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of service of this order, the parties shall meet and confer regarding a second s ummary judgment motion by defendant; no later than five (5) days after the parties have met and conferred (as described above), defendant shall notify the Court whether it wishes to file a second summary judgment motion; and, the October 7, 2015, order's 28-day deadline for the parties to contact the Magistrate Judge is VACATED, and will be reset at a later time. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/23/2015. (Rooney, M)
October 7, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendant's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/7/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 4, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Vacate or Continue Trial, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/4/2015. (The trial date is vacated until after the Court rules on Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. (ECF 25). Court will schedule a case managemen t conference after it decides Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and the parties shall be prepared to set a trial date at that case management conference. Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2015, and Jury Trial set for 8/4/2015 are VACATED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
April 29, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's Late 35 Opposition Filing, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/29/2015. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Court will consider Doc. No. 35 in resolving Defendants motion for summary judgment; and 2. Defendant may file a reply to Doc. No. 35, which may entail the filing of a new reply to the entirety of Plaintiffs opposition (if Defendant deems that to be necessary), within seven (7) days of service of this order.)(Gaumnitz, R)
April 10, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's 31 Ex Parte Application to Extend Time, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/10/2015. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's ex parte application for additional time is GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff may file an opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on or by 4/20/2015; and 3. Defendant may file a reply to Plaintiff's opposition on or by 4/27/2015.) (Gaumnitz, R)
April 6, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 29 Request to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/2015. The Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2015 at 1:30 PM is VACATED. (Hall, S)
December 16, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulation to Modify the Pretrial Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/16/2014. (Hall, S)
October 9, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 Stipulation to Modify the Pretrial Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/8/2014. (Hall, S)
September 8, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause 18 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/8/2014. (Kusamura, W)
August 19, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Plaintiff's Counsel to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions, Up To and Including Dismissal, Should Not Be Issued for Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders and for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2014. Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2014. Status Conference currently set for 9/22/2014 is VACATED. (Hall, S)
January 23, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/23/2014. Consent/Decline Deadline 2/3/2014. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/21/2014. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 2/14/2014. Non-Expert 10/31/2014; Expert 1/12/2015. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/2/2014 at 09:00 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/26/2015; Hearing by 2/23/2015. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 3/2/2015; Hearing by 4/13/2015.Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2015 at 01:30 PM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weeks v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Weeks
Represented By: William J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?