Shapour v. State of California
Plaintiff: Youssef Shapour
Defendant: State of California
Case Number: 1:2013cv01682
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to Stipulation 81 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/16/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re Plaintiff's Motions in Limine (Doc. 67). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/23/2016. (Herman, H)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 15 , 16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, For a More Definite Statement, and to Strike signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/5/2014. Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER vacating hearing date of March 17, 2014 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/13/14. (Nazaroff, H)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying plaintiffs motion for entry of default signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/21/14. (Nazaroff, H)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Entry of Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/13. (Gonzalez, R)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/10/2013. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shapour v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youssef Shapour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?