Arturo Abarca, et al vs Merck & Co., Inc., et al
Plaintiff: MARTIN G. RODRIGUEZ, LOUIE RODRIGUEZ, JUANITA S. RODRIGUEZ, JOVITA RODRIGUEZ, JOSEPHINE RODRIGUEZ, GLORIA RODRIGUEZ, G. R., ESTHER RODRIGUEZ, CINDY RODRIGUEZ, ANTHONY RODRIGUEZ, NICHOLE ROCHETTE, M. R., CLAYTON ROBERTSON, SHAVON ROACH, JULIE RIVARD, JOSHUA RIVARD, JOHN RIVARD, JACOB RIVARD, GLORIA RISNER, BOBBY RISNER, K. R-S., CHRISTINA REYES, TOMMY REID, CIERRA RASMUSSEN, CALEB RASMUSSEN, BOBBY RASMUSSEN, LARRY QUEEN, KENNETH QUEEN, RICHARD CASEY POOL, THOMAS PHOMMASAENG, KHUANG PHOMMASAENG, BOUNYANG PHOMMASAENG, REGINA PETERS, ELIZABETH PERRY, M. P., LARRY PEREZ, DENNIS PEREZ, A. P., ALVIN PENROD, ROGER PENNER, DEBRA PENNER, PATRICIA PALMERIN, LIDUVINA PALMERIN, JUANITA J. PALMERIN, JUANITA PALMERIN, DEBORAH PALMER, ROSA PADILLA, TAYLOR PACHECO, MELODY OVERLY, LOIS OVERLY, ARNOLD OSBORNE, A. O., J. O., MIGUEL ORTEGA, SR., MIGUEL ORTEGA, JR., JUDITH ORTEGA, ANNA ORTEGA, JOSEFINA OROZCO-AGUILERA, E. O., D. O., ORALIA ONSUREZ, LIONEL ONSUREZ, JUDAH ONSUREZ, JOVAN ONSUREZ, ALBERTO MOSES ONSUREZ, ALBERTO ONSUREZ, ABRIEL ONSUREZ, TODD OLSON, SHAWN OBERG, JUANA NUNEZ, GERALDINE NOAKES, KENNETH NICHOLS, JEFFERY NICHOLS, CAROL NICHOLS, MIRNA NAVA, MARIA NAVA, AMANDA NAVA, TABITHA NASH, S. N., Craig Nash, II, CRAIG NASH, CIARA NASH, LARRY NANCE, BERYL NANCE, MARY MYERS, JUSTIN MYERS, L. M., MICHAEL MURRY, MATTHEW MURRAY, CARMELA MURRIETA, ONOFRE GOMEZ MURILLO, JR., BRANDON GOMEZ MURILLO, PHILIP MUMLER, HELEN MUMLER, ALBERT MOSS, AREF MOSLEH, MARIA MORRIS, JAMES MONTGOMERY, KRISTY MONROY, JORGE MONROY, E. M., SADAH MOHAMED, NAGI MOHAMED, GAMELAH MOHAMED, ETLAS MOHAMED, ALI MOHAMED, AHMED MOHAMED, ABLAH MOHAMED, ALAN MOGLIOTTI, JOHN MITTENESS, KENNETH MITTEN, FERN MITTEN, ERNESTO MEZA, JR., N. M., MARTHA MENDOZA, LAURA MENDOZA, JAVIER SR. MENDOZA, J. M., JR., FRANCISCO MENDOZA, ANTONIA MENDOZA, BROOKE JELLO, VERONICA MEJIA, ISIDRO DEJESUS MEJIA, DIANE MEJIA, MARY ANN MEANS, M. M., JAMES McRAY, IYSHA McRAY, H. M., CHRISTIAN McRAY, JASON McMAHON, BREENA McKENNA, JOSHUA McKAY, JOHN McKAY, III, JOHN McKAY, J. M., JACOB McKAY, MELISSA McINTIRE, CLIFFTON McINTIRE, TIMOTHY McGLOTHIN, DENISE McGLOTHIN, TED McDONALD, TAMARA McDONALD, T. M., SHARON McDONALD, DANIEL TRAVIS McDONALD, TERESA MATTOS, DANIEL MAST, S. M., RICHARD MARTINEZ, SR., RICHARD MARTINEZ, JR., NEREYDA MARTINEZ, MARCELA MARTINEZ, JUAN MARTINEZ, CYNTHIA MARTINEZ, TONYA MARTIN, TIM MARTIN, JUSTIN MARTIN, CURTIS MARTIN, JENNIFER MANZO, D. M., GUADALUPE MALDONADO, DEBRA MAIER, JOE MAGSALAY, DIANA MAGSALAY, CHRISTINE MAGSALAY, ARTHUR MAGSALAY, A. M., CHRISTOPHER MAGNANI, DEANNA MADDOCK, TAMMIE MACHADO, W. L., TAMMIE LUND, JOHN LUND, G. L., C. L., SUSAN LUMLEY, MICHAEL J. LUMLEY, MICHAEL LUMLEY, MANUEL LUMLEY, JARED LUMLEY, GREGORY LUMLEY, DONALD LUMLEY, DAWNYEL LUMLEY, FRANK LUCAS, CHERYL LOVETT, ELIZABETH LOPEZ-CALDERON, ARMONDO LOPEZ, KERRY LONG, K. L., DAVID LONG, JR., JAVIER LOMELI, ANDREW LOMELI, SR., A. L., JR., VICK SR. LOFTIN, VICK LOFTIN, JR., ALTON LOFTIN, DYLAN LOCKEN, CHARLIE LIVERMORE, NICHOLAS LISSY, PHILLIS LINDSAY, LEMAN LIGHT, STEVEN LEWIS, S. L., RICHARD LEONARDO, SARAH LEE, CHASITY LEE, BRENDA LEE, A. L., PATRICIA LAYTON, KAREN LAY, CHRISTIAN LANUM, DONNA LANGDON, BRUCE LANGDON, VICTORIA NAWROCKI LANE, ROBERT LANE, N. L., J. L., MARY LANDERS, SHELLEY KRUMMEN, RALPH J. KRUMMEN, JR., DERRICK KRUMMEN, BRAD KRUMMEN, TAMI KIRBY, JESSICA KIRBY, AMBER KIRBY, MARCIA KENDALL, PEGGY JOOS, SHANNON JONES, D. J., ASHLEY JONES, ANNE JONES, CLYDE K.M. JOHNSTON, PAULA JOHNSON, PAUL K. JOHNSON, VICTORIA JIMENEZ, ROSEMARY JIMENEZ, NATALYA JIMENEZ, N. J., MICHAEL JIMENEZ, EVA JIMENEZ, E. J., KAMIE JENSEN, ROSEMARY JENKINS, MILLARD JENKINS, JOHN JENKINS, JEREMY JENKINS, CASSANDRA JENKINS, XAIRO JARAMILLO, MARIA JARAMILLO, SONIA JARAMILLO, MARIA LULU JARAMILLO, CYNTHIA JACOBO, ALBERT JACOBO, S. I., SALENA INOCENCIO, RICHARD INOCENCIO, M. I., F. A.D. I., MELISSA HVASS (BIANCHI), SANDRA HUMPHREY, DORIS HUGHES, APRIL DAWN HOWELL, JUMNONG HOWELL, JERRY HORTON, ESTHER HORTON, DAYNA HOPKINS, KARIE HOLT, VINCENT HOLLAND, STEVE HOLLAND, RAMONA HOLLAND, TERI HOFFMAN, RANDY HOFFMAN, KRISTINE HOFFMAN, JOSEPH HOFFMAN, ELISSA MARIE HOFFMAN, DEREK HOFFMAN, LISA HODGDON, JARED HOGDON, DAN HODGDON, STEPHANIE HOATSON, JEFFERY HOATSON, RACHEL HIROTA, MATTHEW HIROTA, J. H., MISTY HILDRED, ANTHONY HIGHT, SABRINA HIGGINS, KIMBERLY HIGGINS, GAYLA HIGGINS, ERIC HIGGINS, ROSA HIGAREDA, N. H., GERARDO HIGAREDA, LORI HICKS-ROEHRENBAECK, F. H-R., DORA LEE HICKS, DANNY MICHAEL HICKS, DARLA HETRICH, VIRGINIA HERNANDEZ, JONATHAN HERNANDEZ, CINDY HERNANDEZ, ASHLEY HERNANDEZ, ANTHONY HERNANDEZ, SABRINA HENSON, BRANDON HENSON, RYAN HEISLEY, SONDRA HEFTY, KAREN HAYWARD, LADONNA HAYES, RANDY HAYER, KATE HAYER, LINDA HAWKINS, SUZANNE HARWELL, TRACY HARVEY, MICHELLE HARVEY, M. H., JAMES J. HARVEY, CHRISTOPHER HARVEY, SR., CARLO HARVEY, SR., C. H., JR., A. H., AMELIA HARVEY, B. H., TED HARRIS, MARY HANSON, KENNETH HANSON, JACQUELINE HAND, CHRISTIE HAMILTON, MICHAEL HALL, TERA GUZMAN, ROBERT GUZMAN, JR., ROBERT GUZMAN, SR., OLGA GUZMAN, JOSEFA GUZMAN, ROSA GUTIERREZ, LESLIE GUTIERREZ, JESUS GUTIERREZ, ISAAC GUTIERREZ, HUGO GUTIERREZ, LORENA GUTHRIE, DON GUTHRIE, HOLLY GUTFELD, HECTOR GURROLA, AMANDA GURROLA, SILVIA GUEVARA, STEPHANIE GRISSOM, AIRIEN GRISSOM, DANIELLE GRIER, NORMA GREGORY, GARRY GREENAWALT, CHRISTINE GOODMAN, WHITTNEY GOODFELLOW, SAMUEL GOODFELLOW, RICK GOODFELLOW, KIM GOODFELLOW, ERIC GOODFELLOW, SONIA GONZALES, ROXANNE GONZALES, RONALD GONZALES, SR., RONALD GONZALES, JR., RICKY GONZALES, RICARDO GONZALES, N. G., MARIO GONZALES, LISA ANN GONZALES, JULIE ANN GONZALES, JOSHUA GONZALES, JOSEPH GONZALES, JASMINE GONZALES, GUADALUPE GONZALES, JR., ELIZABETH GONZALES, CHRISTINA GONZALES, CATHERINE GONZALES, CARLOS GONZALES, ASHLEY GONZALES, ANTHONY GONZALES, SR., ANTHONY GONZALES, JR., ROBERT GOMEZ, ONOFRE GOMEZ, SR., MELODY GOMEZ, MARJORIE GOMEZ, LEO GOMEZ, GLORIA GOMEZ, F. E. G., FATIMA GOMEZ, D. G., ADRIANNA GOMEZ, MARAYAHA GOEBEL, CHRISTOPHER GOEBEL, TAMMY GODFREY, RODNEY GODFREY, JOHN GLORIA, DIANNA GLORIA, AMBER GLEASON, JAMES GIETLER, YUIDICO GARZA, MYRIE GARZA, MIKIE GARZA, MIKE GARZA, IVAN GARCIA-PRADO, AGUSTIN GARCIA-PRADO, S. G., ESPERANZA GARCIA, A. G., AUSTIN GARCIA, MIRNA ROSALVA GALVAN, JOSE GALVAN, EDGAR GALVAN, CYNTHIA GALVAN, BRENDA GALVAN, REBECCA GALLARDO, ERIC FULMER, DREW FULMER, KATHY FRENCH, RANDY FREITAS, ERIC FREITAS, MELISSA FREGO, SCOTT FREEMAN, T. F., JIMMY FOWLER, GARRY J.A. FOWLER, ERIKA FOWLER, BRUCE FOWLER, AMBER FOWLER, WHITNEY FOLTZ, ASHLEY FOLTZ, J. F., STEVEN FLOWERS, MELISSA FLOWERS, JENNIFER FLOWERS, DEANNA FLOWERS, S. F., MIGUEL FLORES, MICHAEL MERAZ FLORES, MICHAEL E. FLORES, MICHAEL A. FLORES, MICHAEL FLORES, I. F., GINGER FLORES, CHANTE FLORES, CARMEN FLORES, STACY FISTER, JOHN CECIL FISSELL, ROBERT FIERRO, ERNEST FIERRO, AGUSTINA FIERRO, RYAN FIELDS, RANDY FIELDS, RACHEL FIELDS, JANICE FIELDS, HALEY FIELDS, FRANK FIELDS, A. F., MANUEL FERNANDEZ, TINA FENTON, EARL FARRELL, M. F., CHRISTINE EWART, LITICIA ESPINOSA, LYDIA ESPINO, LEO ESPINO, WILLIAM ERNEST, J. E., WILLIAM KIRK EMERICH, TIM EMERICH, PAT EMERICH, ZANA ELTAREB, YAHYA ELTAREB, THAHER M. ELTAREB, TAHA ELTAREB, SITRA ELTAREB, SABA ELTAREB, N. E., MUSA ELTAREB, MOHSEN ELTAREB, M. E., MATT ELTAREB, KAREMA ELTAREB, I. E., H. E., HOSAIN ELTAREB, HADEEIA ELTAREB, GAMEELAH ELTAREB, G. E., FAZIA ELTAREB, FAWAS ELTAREB, FATHIA ELTAREB, FATHI ELTAREB, EMAN ELTAREB, D. E., BAHALWAN ELTAREB, A. E., SUSAN ELSON, REBECCA EDWARDS, MEGAN RENEE EDWARDS, JAMES EDWARDS, LISA EDDINGS-ROSS, K. E-R., JESSE EDDINGS, JR., ANNA EDDINGS, PHILLIP EASTON, BILL DUNNING, SHAMISHA DUNHAM, RONALD DUNHAM, SR., RONALD DUNHAM, JR., LATONYA DUNHAM, CATHY DUNHAM, JOSE DUARTE, FLAVIO DUARTE, THOMAS DRISCOLL, TARA DRISCOLL, MEGAN DRISCOLL, MADISON DRISCOLL, COLTON DRISCOLL, JACKIE DOUTHIT, LEONARDO DIAZ, SR., L. D., JR., RICHARD DIAMOND, ROCKY DELTE, PAUL DELTE, JANIE DELTE, GRACE KATRINA DELTE, THERESA DELGADO, FRED DELGADO, RYAN DEAN, OMAR DE LEON, MATILDA DE LEON, MANUEL DE LEON, LUIS DE LEON, FELIPE DE LEON, ALBERT DE LEON, VINCENT DE ANGELO, YINGYONG DAYTON, SUSAN DAVIS, JEROME DAVIS, J. D., DAWN DAVIS, Lou Ann Dautrich-Mathewson, JAMES ALLEN DAUTRICH, JR., DEBORAH SUE DAUTRICH, MICHAEL DANIELS, CHERYL DANIELS, CHARITY CURTIS, TIM CURTICE, KEITH CURTICE, JERADITH CURTICE, FRANCES CURTICE, DONALD CURTICE, RON CUNNINGHAM, TROY CUNHA, CURTICE CUNHA, ANGELA CUESTAS, HOLLY CRUZ, MICHAEL CRESCI, SHAVELLA CRAWFORD, CASSONDRA CRAWFORD, RALPH COWDEN, JASON COWDEN, DEBBIE COWDEN, ROSE COSTA, DAVID COSTA, LARRY CORTINAS, DOUGLAS CORTINAS, PATRICA CORTEZ, BASILIO CORTEZ, ANGEL CORTEZ, JESSE CORTEZ, SANTIAGO CORREA, RAY CORREA, ORLANDO CORREA, BRANDICE CORNELIUS, GERALD COOK, JR., DOROTHY COOK, JEREMIAH CONCEPCION, LUZ ESPERANZA COLON, JODI COLEMAN, STEPHANIE COHN, JASON CODD, STEVEN CLEVELAND, B. C., BLANCA CLARK, MARIA CIENFUEGOS, AMTUL CHEEMA, AMER CHEEMA, LUPE CHAVEZ-VARGAS, LUCINA CHAVEZ-GONZALES, VICTOR CHAVEZ, SALVADOR CHAVEZ, RAMON CHAVEZ, PATRICIA JARAMILLO CHAVEZ, I. C., HECTOR CHAVEZ, GILBERT CHAVEZ, ELVA CHAVEZ, DANIEL CHAVEZ, D.C., BENITO CHAVEZ, A. C., JASON CHAPPELL, DIANE CHAPPELL, T. C., JUSTIN CHAMPLIN, Z. C., O. C., MICHAELA CHAIREZ, KARINA CHAIREZ, JOSE CHAIREZ, GUADALUPE CHAIREZ, RAVINDAR CHAHAL, GURBACHAN CHAHAL, DAVINDAR CHAHAL, CARLA CERVANTES, MIGUEL CENTENO, CARMEN CENTENO, VERONICA CAVAZOS, THOMAS CAVAZOS, THELMA CAVAZOS, SANJUANITA CAVAZOS, MANUELA CAVAZOS, LIDIA CAVAZOS, JOSE CAVAZOS, EMILIO CAVAZOS, EDDIE CAVAZOS, DONNA CATES, BRYAN CATES, TIM CASTLEBERRY, SARA CASTLEBERRY, RAYMOND CASTLEBERRY, BRIAN CASTLEBERRY, COLETTE CASTELLINO, BENEDICT CASTELLINO, YESENIA CASTANEDA, ROY CASTANEDA, RENE CASTANEDA, CARLOS CASTANEDA, ASHLEE CARTER, ALISHA CARPENTER, ROSA CARDENAS, RENE CARDENAS, EGAR CARDENAS, SR., EDGAR CARDENAS, JR., DESIRE CARDENAS, BARBARA CARDENAS, VETA CAPERS, TRACY CAPERS, SHILOH CAPERS, SHELBY CAPERS, RACHEL CAPERS, MALLORY CAPERS, LADONNA CAPERS, JUSTIN CAPERS, JESSIE CAPERS, JARROD CAPERS, FRANK CAPERS, SR., FRANK CAPERS, JR., EMMETT CAPERS, TEODORA CAMPOS, JOHN CALLAHAN, AUSTIN CALLAHAN, MIKE CAETANO, ALAN CADIENTE, KRISTIN BYNUM, O. B., MEGAN BURK, JOHN BURK, CHRISTINE BURK, VERNA BURCHETT, JOHN BURCHETT, LINDA BRYSON, MONICA BRUSHIA, SARAH BRUMMELL (BIANCHI), LAURA RACHELLE BROCK, TAYLOR BRIGGS, S. B., MELINDA BRIGGS, JOSEPH BRIGGS, CINDY BRIGGS, MELINDA BRASIL, GARY BRASIL, CHRISTOPHER BRASIL, CARLOS BRASIL, TERRY BOYD, PAUL BOYD, KIMBERLY BOYD, DESEREE BOYD, CLINTON BOYD, JR., CLINTON BOYD, BRYAN BOYD, REBECCA BOWDEN, LORETTA BOUNE, TONY BOUN, PANY BOUN, LESLIE BOUN, IRIS BOUN, BILLY BOUN, JOHN BLITCH, AROONRASAMEE BLITCH, BRANDY BLANKENSHIP, VERNON BLAKEY, JR., STACY BLAKEY, MEGAN BLACK, JIMMY LEE BLACK, ELISA BLACK, DENNIS BLACK, JANELLE BISHOP, GEORGE BIANCHI, DIANNE BIANCHI, JUSTIN BEUTEL, JESSICA BEUTEL, CHRISTOPHER BEUTEL, ALLYNE BEUTEL, MANUEL BETTENCOURT, III, LORALEE BETTENCOURT, DIANA BERGER, A. B., Y. B., C. B., EREZ BATAT, CASSIE BARRON, ROCIO BARRAGAN, OMAR BARRAGAN, MARIA BARRAGAN, JUAN BARRAGAN, J. B., DAVID BARRAGAN, ANNA BARRAGAN, ALEX BARRAGAN, ADAN BARRAGAN, JOVANA BARNES, CHARLES BARNES, ROBERT BARIA, PHILIP BARIA, PHILIP BARIA, JR., IRENE BARIA, BRITTANY BARIA, ASHLEY BARIA, ANTONIO BARIA, JR., DAN BAKER, ANGELICA BAC, TERRI AZEVEDO, ELIAS AZEVEDO, RICARDO AYALA, RAUL AYALA, OLIVIA AYALA, MARIA AYALA, ELIZONDO AYALA, CARLOS AYALA, ADRIANNA AYALA, VALERIE AVILA, LAWRENCE AUTRY, JENNIFER ASLETT, TINA ARRIOLA, ROBERT ARRIOLA, CRYSTAL ARRIOLA DOHERTY, ROY ARCEO, CHERYL ARCEO, SHARON ANDERSON, O. A., II, OSCAR ALVAREZ, Maria Alvarez, IRENE ALVAREZ, GARY ALTOM, E. A., STEVEN ALLEN, SR., STEVEN ALLEN, JR., R. A., G. A., A. A., RYAN ALCANTARA, ALICIA ALARCON, JORGE ALAMO, ANGELICA AGUILAR, ABRAHAM AGUILAR, BARBARA ANN ADAME-SANCHEZ, TONEY ACKMAN, J. A., CATHRYN ACKMAN, TERESA ABARCA, ROY ABARCA, PATRICIA ABARCA, FERNANDO ABARCA, DENISE ABARCA, CRISTINA ABARCA, ARTURO ABARCA, MARTIN L. RODRIGUEZ, RICHARD RODRIGUEZ, JR., RICHARD RODRIGUEZ, SR., ROGELIO RODRIGUEZ, JR., ROGELIO RODRIGUEZ, SR., ROSEMARIE RODRIGUEZ, RYAN RODRIGUEZ, VICKY RODRIGUEZ, AUSTIN ROGGE, BREANNE ROGGE, ANA ROJAS, ANA MARIA ROJAS, BRIAN ROJAS, JOSE ROJAS, MICHELLE ROJAS, K. R., R., KENDALL ROSS, SR., ARTHUR RUIZ, CRYSTAL RUIZ, REBECCA RUIZ, PAULETTE SABOL, A. S., MOUANG SAEPHANH-SAVOIE, CHENG LIN SAETEURN, CINDY SAGMILLER, TOM SAGMILLER, MARK SAIZ, AIDDA SALAS, C. S., JR., B. S., I. S., ESMERELDA SALDANA, ESTELLA SALDANA, GUADALUPE SALDANA, N. S., GUILLERMO SALDIVAR, GUILLERMO A. SALDIVAR, J. S., NATASHA SALDIVAR, RONALD SALDOVAR, JEREMY SALYERS, L. S., MANDY SALYERS, T. S., Eric J. Samuelson, II, GENEVA SAMUELSON, Anthony Sanchez, Ben Sanchez, Brianna Sanchez, Daniel Sanchez, ERIC SANCHEZ, GUSTAVO SANCHEZ, ISABEL SANCHEZ, ISABEL D. SANCHEZ, JENNIFER SANCHEZ, JESUS SANCHEZ, JOSE SANCHEZ, JOSEPH SANCHEZ, LAZARO SANCHEZ, MARIA ELSA SANCHEZ, MELANIE SANCHEZ, RAYMOND SANCHEZ, SERGIO SANCHEZ, JR., SERGIO SANCHEZ, SR., SHIRLEY SANCHEZ, SONIA SANCHEZ, SUSAN SANCHEZ, TIMOTHY SANCHEZ, DUSTIN SANDERS, ANTHONY SANTOS, ADELENE SARABIA, EDUARDO SARABIA, FELIPE SARABIA, MARIA SARABIA, HIROKI SAVOIE, S. S., AUTUMN SCHINDLER, NATHAN SCHINDLER, J. S-W., ANTHONY SCHLESSINGER, DOMOSSIE SCOGGINS, MATTHEW SCOTTING, SHERRAL SCOTTING, AURA SEBASTIAO, D. S., JR., DAVID SEBASTIAO, SR., D. S., JOSE SEBASTIAO, KRYSTAL SEBASTIAO, LIZ SEBASTIAO, STEVEN SEBASTIAO, GUILLERMO SEGOVIA, ROSEMARY SHAFER, JASMINE SHAHROK, RACINE SHAHROCK, ADRIA SHARP, M. S., CARMEN SHEHORN, CHARLES SHEHORN, JOHN SHEHORN, KATHRYN SHEHORN, K. S., ANTHONY SHERMAN, THERESA SHERMAN, ANNA SILVA, JESUS SILVA, SR., KENDRA SILVA, MARK SIMMONS, R. S., RICHARD SIMMONS, CHASTITY SMILEY, LARRY SMILEY, JR., DEREK SMITH, MICHAEL C. SMITH, DELORES RENEE SMYTH, RAYMOND SMYTH, CHRISTINE SNYDER, ANGELINA SOLIS, GEORGE SOLIS, JOSIE SOLIS, MARCOS SOLIS, MONICA SOLIS, REBECCA SONG, SHUWU SONG, GARY SOUTHERLAND, DIANNE SPARKS, JON BRADLEY SPEAR, ROBERT SPEAR, DUSTIN SPRAGUE, ROBIN SPRAGUE, SCOTT LEE SPRAGUE, TERRY SPRAGUE, IVY SPRATLING, JAMES STANGER, JANIS STANGER, PAUL STANGER, ROBERT STANKO, KATHERINE STOUT, HEIDI STRAUSS, DAINA STRICKLAND, JOSHUA STRICKLAND, TIFFANY STRICKLAND, TONI STRUCK, JENNIFER TAYLOR, JASON TEIXEIRA, DENG THAO, J. T., K. T., KOU THAO, MAIYEE THAO, PANGDAO THAO, SONG THAO, SUE THAO, GEORGE THAYER, JAYME (NOBI) THAYER, JOSE TORRES, ERLINDA TRUJILLO, MICHAEL TRUJILLO, MICHELLE TUCKER, ADRIAN TURNER, JASMINE TURNER, LESTER TURNER, II, SABRINA TURNER, SHERRY TURNER, ANNETTE URANGA, CRUZ URANGA, MICHAEL URANGA, MICKAELA URANGA, A. U., LILIANA UVALLE, RAMONA UVALLE, SALVADOR UVALLE, JR., SALVADOR UVALLE, SR., FELICIA VALDEZ-ADAME, CARLOS VALENCIA, LINDA VALLIER, FAIREN VARGAS, DEBORA VARNEY, DONALD VARNEY, JR., DONALD VARNEY, SR., MELISSA VARNEY, ASHLEY VARTABEDIAN, DANIEL VARTABEDIAN, N. V., G. V., JESUS VELIZ, J. V., MARIA VELIZ, ELIZABETH VIRREY, ISABEL VIRREY, LUCIO VIRREY, LAMBERTO VIZCARRA, MARIA VIZCARRA, JOHN WALSH, NATHAN WANDICK, E. W., ERIC WARD, K. W., O. W., JASON WARDEN, BETTY WARREN, SHANNON WARREN, DAVID WATLAND, EDWARD WATLAND, JENNIFER WATLAND, CLIFTON WATTS, JENNIFER J. WEGNER, LINDA WEGNER, MIKEL WEGNER, NOEL WEGNER, A. W., C. W., MICHAEL WEIGHTMAN, SABRINA WEIGHTMAN, CHARLES WHITAKER, JOANNE WHITAKER, MARK WHITAKER, JACLYN WHITE, ADAM WIES, CAROL WILLIAMS, ELIJAH BRYANT WILLIAMS, EMMANUEL WIMER, SANDRA WIMER, CANDICE WINDER, CORRINE WINDER, KATRINA WINDER, THOMAS WINDER, TRUDY WINDER, DEBORAH WOHLTMAN, WILLIAM WOHLTMAN, FRANCIS EDDIE WOMACK, LEON WOMACK, MARTHA WOMACK, MICHAEL WOMACK, MICKIE WOMACK, ROBERT E. WOMACK, ROBERT L. WOMACK, RODNEY WRIGHT, KEOTA XIONG, PA XIONG, CATRINA YAPIT, F. Y., III, FELIPE YAPIT, JR., IRENE YAPIT, CRYSTAL ZARATE, H. Z., VIRGINIA ZENDEJAS, F.R. and Reyna Fernandez
Defendant: Merck & Co. Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company and Amsted Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01689
Filed: October 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice, signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 1/16/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Relating Cases, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/8/14. (Verduzco, M)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 12/30/13. Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2014 at 08:30 AM.(Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arturo Abarca, et al vs Merck & Co., Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN G. RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA S. RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOVITA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPHINE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. R.
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTHER RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLE ROCHETTE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. R.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAYTON ROBERTSON
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAVON ROACH
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE RIVARD
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA RIVARD
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN RIVARD
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB RIVARD
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA RISNER
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY RISNER
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. R-S.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA REYES
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMY REID
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIERRA RASMUSSEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALEB RASMUSSEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY RASMUSSEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY QUEEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH QUEEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CASEY POOL
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS PHOMMASAENG
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHUANG PHOMMASAENG
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOUNYANG PHOMMASAENG
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINA PETERS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH PERRY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. P.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY PEREZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS PEREZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVIN PENROD
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER PENNER
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA PENNER
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA PALMERIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIDUVINA PALMERIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA J. PALMERIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA PALMERIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH PALMER
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA PADILLA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLOR PACHECO
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELODY OVERLY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOIS OVERLY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARNOLD OSBORNE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. O.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. O.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL ORTEGA, SR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL ORTEGA, JR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH ORTEGA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA ORTEGA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEFINA OROZCO-AGUILERA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. O.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. O.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORALIA ONSUREZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIONEL ONSUREZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDAH ONSUREZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOVAN ONSUREZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTO MOSES ONSUREZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTO ONSUREZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABRIEL ONSUREZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD OLSON
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN OBERG
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANA NUNEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALDINE NOAKES
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH NICHOLS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERY NICHOLS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL NICHOLS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRNA NAVA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA NAVA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA NAVA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TABITHA NASH
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. N.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Nash, II
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG NASH
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIARA NASH
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY NANCE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERYL NANCE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY MYERS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN MYERS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. M.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MURRY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MURRAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMELA MURRIETA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONOFRE GOMEZ MURILLO, JR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON GOMEZ MURILLO
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP MUMLER
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN MUMLER
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT MOSS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AREF MOSLEH
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA MORRIS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTY MONROY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE MONROY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. M.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SADAH MOHAMED
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAGI MOHAMED
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAMELAH MOHAMED
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETLAS MOHAMED
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALI MOHAMED
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMED MOHAMED
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABLAH MOHAMED
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN MOGLIOTTI
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MITTENESS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH MITTEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERN MITTEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNESTO MEZA, JR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. M.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA MENDOZA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA MENDOZA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAVIER SR. MENDOZA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. M., JR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO MENDOZA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIA MENDOZA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKE JELLO
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA MEJIA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISIDRO DEJESUS MEJIA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE MEJIA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY ANN MEANS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. M.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES McRAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IYSHA McRAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. M.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN McRAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON McMAHON
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BREENA McKENNA
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA McKAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN McKAY, III
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN McKAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. M.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB McKAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA McINTIRE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFTON McINTIRE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY McGLOTHIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE McGLOTHIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TED McDONALD
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMARA McDONALD
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. M.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON McDONALD
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL TRAVIS McDONALD
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA MATTOS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL MAST
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. M.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MARTINEZ, SR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MARTINEZ, JR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEREYDA MARTINEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCELA MARTINEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN MARTINEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONYA MARTIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIM MARTIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN MARTIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS MARTIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER MANZO
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. M.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUADALUPE MALDONADO
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA MAIER
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE MAGSALAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA MAGSALAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE MAGSALAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR MAGSALAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MAGNANI
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA MADDOCK
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMIE MACHADO
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. L.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMIE LUND
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN LUND
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. L.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. L.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN LUMLEY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. LUMLEY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LUMLEY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL LUMLEY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARED LUMLEY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY LUMLEY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD LUMLEY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWNYEL LUMLEY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK LUCAS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL LOVETT
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH LOPEZ-CALDERON
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMONDO LOPEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRY LONG
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. L.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LONG, JR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAVIER LOMELI
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW LOMELI, SR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. L., JR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICK SR. LOFTIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICK LOFTIN, JR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTON LOFTIN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DYLAN LOCKEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLIE LIVERMORE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS LISSY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIS LINDSAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEMAN LIGHT
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN LEWIS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. L.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD LEONARDO
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH LEE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASITY LEE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA LEE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. L.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA LAYTON
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN LAY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN LANUM
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA LANGDON
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE LANGDON
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA NAWROCKI LANE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LANE
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. L.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. L.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY LANDERS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELLEY KRUMMEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH J. KRUMMEN, JR.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK KRUMMEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAD KRUMMEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMI KIRBY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA KIRBY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBER KIRBY
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIA KENDALL
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY JOOS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON JONES
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. J.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY JONES
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE JONES
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLYDE K.M. JOHNSTON
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULA JOHNSON
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL K. JOHNSON
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA JIMENEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARY JIMENEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATALYA JIMENEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. J.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JIMENEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVA JIMENEZ
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. J.
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMIE JENSEN
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARY JENKINS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILLARD JENKINS
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael John Bidart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times