Guimarra v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Giumarra
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv01690
Filed: October 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2015. (Hernandez, M)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER awarding EAJA Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/2015. (Hernandez, M)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Voluntary Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and for Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order on joint stipulation to extend Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's confidential letter brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/30/2014. (Commissioner's Confidential Letter due by 6/27/2014; Plaintiff's Opening Brief filed by 7/28/2014; Commissioner's Responsive Brief filed by 8/28/2014; Plaintiff's Reply Brief filed by 9/12/2014) (Figueroa, O)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. 2 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/22/2013. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guimarra v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Giumarra
Represented By: Roger David Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?