February 5, 2016 |
Filing
88
ORDER Re Stipulation to Dismiss 87 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/5/16: This action is DISMISSED with prejudice; The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this action. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
|
November 20, 2015 |
Filing
82
ORDER Adopting 79 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Unopposed Petition for Approval of Compromise of the Claims of Minor Plaintiff J.F., by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Bridget Flores signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/20/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
|
November 3, 2015 |
Filing
79
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Unopposed Petition for Approval of Compromise of the Claims of Minor Plaintiff J.F., By and Through His Guardian Ad Litem Bridget Flores (Doc. 76). Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within < b>fourteen (14) days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, the parties may file written objections with the Court. To expedite resolution of these Findings and Recommendations, if the parties do not have any objections, they should each file a Notice of NonObjection to Findings and Recommendations. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/3/2015. (Herman, H)
|
July 2, 2015 |
Filing
69
ORDER Denying Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause Why a Contempt Citatiion Should Not Issue (Doc. 66). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/2/2015. (Herman, H)
|
June 26, 2015 |
Filing
67
ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to File Response to Defendants' Ex Parte Application (Doc. 66). Plaintiffs are directed to file a response toDefendants application no later than noon on Tuesday, June 30, 2015. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/2015. (Herman, H)
|
March 23, 2015 |
Filing
62
Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and PROTECTIVE ORDER re Release of Peace Officer Personnel Records, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/23/2015. (Herman, H)
|
March 11, 2015 |
Filing
60
ORDER After IN CAMERA Inspection of the Personnel File of Defendant Tim Haener and Consideration of Defendants' Supplemental Brief. ORDER Requiring Production of Certain Documents from the Personnel File. Parties are to work out languag e of a protective order and submit to the Court within ten (10) days. Defendant City shall, within fifteen (15) days of entry of protective order, provide the responsive documents to Plaintiffs. Defendants shall contact chambers to make arrangements to retrieve their copy of the personnel file submitted for the in camera review. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/11/2015. (Herman, H)
|
January 23, 2015 |
Filing
56
ORDER After Preliminary IN CAMERA Inspection of the Personnel File of Defendant Tim Haener. ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF and for the BRIEF to be FILED UNDER SEAL: the defendants shall provide a supplemental brief regarding the privilege. Due to its confidential nature, the Court will Order that the supplemental briefing shall be SEALED. The brief is limited to 10 pages. Defendant shall submit their briefing not later than February 13, 2015, as a Word document, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. The Court will then file the document under seal. Defendants are directed NOT to serve the Plaintiff with the supplemental briefing. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/22/2015. (Herman, H)
|
January 15, 2015 |
Filing
54
FURTHER STIPULATION and ORDER re In Camera Review of Peace Officer's Personnel File (Doc. 53 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/15/2015. (Arellano, S.)
|
January 6, 2015 |
Filing
52
STIPULATION and ORDER re IN CAMERA REVIEW of Peace Officer's Personnel File, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/6/2015. (Herman, H)
|
October 8, 2014 |
Filing
45
ORDER Regarding Joint Stipulation to File Amended Pleading (Doc. 43): (1) Plaintiff's request for leave to file 3rd Amended Complaint is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their 3rd Amended Complaint within 5 days court days of the date of this ORDER is filed; (3) Defendant City Visalia's response shall be served and filed 20 days thereof; (4) All dates currently scheduled in this matter are not affected by this order. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/8/2014. (Herman, H)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing
33
ORDER on Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 29 ), Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/4/2014. (Arellano, S.)
|
March 3, 2014 |
Filing
26
ORDER on Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 21 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/3/14. (Hellings, J)
|
January 7, 2014 |
Filing
19
ORDER DISMISSING Defendant County of Tulare Without Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/7/14. (Hellings, J)
|
December 30, 2013 |
Filing
17
ORDER to VACATE HEARING set for January 22, 2014 for 13 Motion to Dismiss, in that the FAC renders moot the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/30/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
December 24, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER Regarding Joint Stipulation 14 to File Amended Pleading. (1) Plaintiffs' request for leave to file a First Amended Complaint is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiff shall file their First Amended Complaint within 5 calendar days of the date of this ORDER; (3) Defendant City of Visalia's response to Plantiffs' First Amended Complaint shall be served and filed no more than 20 days hereof. The Court notes that Defendant City of Visalia hereby waives notice and accepts service of the pr oposed First Amended Complaint on behalf of Defendant City of Visalia by and through the City's counsel record; (4) All dates currently scheduled in this matter are not affected by this order. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/24/2013. (Herman, H)
|
October 25, 2013 |
Filing
8
ORDER Appointing Bridget Flores Guardian Ad Litem for J.F., a Minor signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/2013. (Flores, E)
|