Sequoia ForestKeeper, et al. v. Elliott, et al.
Plaintiff: Sequoia ForestKeeper, Center for Biological Diversity and Western Watersheds Project
Defendant: Kevin B. Elliott and United States Forest Service
Case Number: 1:2013cv01721
Filed: October 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Affirming Defendants' 46 Bill of Costs, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/4/2015. (It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs 47 objection to Defendants bill of costs is hereby OVERRULED. Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to PAY Defendants the amount requested in Defendants' Bill of Costs.)(Gaumnitz, R)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER for Clerk to Enter Judgment and CLOSE the CASE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/3/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER on Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Granting Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/31/2015. (It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for reconsideration of the court's September 25 Order is hereby DENIED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER on Parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Orders, (Docs. 18 19 23 24 ) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/25/2014. (It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary ju dgment is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is correspondingly DENIED. Defendants' motions to strike are GRANTED to the extent set forth above. The motion of Sierra Forest Products to appear as amicus curiae is DENIED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order VACATING hearing date of June 16, 2014 and taking matter under submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/11/2014. (Figueroa, O)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE OF APRIL 28, 2014, AND TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/22/2014. (Kusamura, W)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/9/2013. Administrative Record Deadlines: Filing 1/24/2014; Informal Objections 2/7/2014. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opening Brief 2/28/2014; Defendant's Opposition/Cross Motion 3/28/2014; Plaintiff's Reply/Opposition to Cross Motion 4/11/2014; Defendant Reply to Cross Motion 4/25/2014; Hearing 6/16/2014. (Hall, S)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING the Stipulation to Advance the Mandatory Scheduling Conference re 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/27/2013. Initial Scheduling Conference ADVANCED to 12/9/2013 at 09:00 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sequoia ForestKeeper, et al. v. Elliott, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequoia ForestKeeper
Represented By: Rene Peter Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Justin John Augustine
Represented By: Rene Peter Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Rene Peter Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin B. Elliott
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?