United States of America v. Mallery et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Michael P Mallery and Rebeca C Mallery
Case Number: 1:2013cv01737
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER - The discovery cutoff date in this action shall be continued from 12/28/2014 to 1/27/2015; All discovery, including any motions to compel, must be completed by 1/27/2015; Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 2/23/2015. The prior scheduling orders shall remain in effect in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/9/2014. (Hernandez, M)
January 21, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/21/2015. (Timken, A)
March 2, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Dates and REQUIRING Parties to File Dispositional Documents by May 15, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/2/15. (Marrujo, C)
May 18, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Parties to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Issue For Failure to File Dispositional Documents in Compliance with Court Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/18/2015. (Hernandez, M)
May 21, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Dismiss and Discharging Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/21/15. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mallery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P Mallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebeca C Mallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.