Moore v. Gipson et al
Plaintiff: Merrick Jose Moore
Defendant: Connie Gipson, J. Cavazos, R.L. Davis, J.D. Lozano, Karen Cribbs, E. Henery, A. Casas, J. Gonzalez, R. Southard and S. Longoria
Case Number: 1:2013cv01820
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 JUDGMENT dated *5/2/19*. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE and ORDER that Plaintiff Merrick Jose Moore, CDCR #H-82249, is no Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/2/19. (Gonzalez, R)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE and ORDER that Inmate Jamise Jermaine Calloway, CDCR #P-97743, is no Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/1/19. (Gonzalez, R)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Return Witness Fees for Witness Sabios signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/29/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Jamise Jermaine Calloway, CDCR #P-97743, on Tuesday, 04/30/2019 at 8:30a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/25/19. (Gonzalez, R)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 140 Motion in Limine signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/24/19. (Gonzalez, R)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Regarding Plaintiff's Failure to Provide Sufficient Information to Effectuate Service on Registered Nurse Sabios, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/3/19. Show Cause Response Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Witness, Jamise Jermaine Calloway, #P-97743, on April 29, 2019 at 8:30a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/19. (Gonzalez, R)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Directing Service of Subpoena on Witnesses by the United States Marshal Without Prepayment of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/27/2019. Service to be made on witnesses Sergeant C. Love, Registered Nurse Sabios and Registered Nurse B. Savage. (Jessen, A)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 133 Motion for Reconsideration of Incarcerated Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/22/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' 116 Motion to Modify Second Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/4/2019. (Motion in Limine: 04/1/2019 ; Opposition to Motion: 04/15/2019; Motion in Limine Hearing: 04/24/2019 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 8; Jury Trial: 04/29/2019 at 8:30am, Courtroom 8) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Modify Second Scheduling Order and to Reset Deadlines re 116 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/13/19. Deadline: 03/08/2019. (Gonzalez, R)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER to Re-Caption Case signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/7/2019. (Jessen, A)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DENYING 108 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/7/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DENYING 109 Motion for Appointment of Expert signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/4/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 103 Motion to Compel Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 82 Motion to Compel as Moot ; ORDER DENYING 96 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/14/18. (Dispositive Motions due 10/15/2018) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING 99 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/5/18. (Marrujo, C)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/2018: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Hellings, J)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Status Report and Motion for Court Order and Directing the Parties to Meet and Confer 82 ; ORDER STAYING Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Request to Suspend All Matters in This Case or Grant 90-Day Extension of Time 76 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/29/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Striking Declaration of Non-Party 68 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/16/2018. (Hellings, J)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants 55 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/15/2018. (Hellings, J)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery and directing Plaintiff to serve Supplemental Responses to Discovery within 30-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/6/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER reinstating briefing on 43 MOTION to COMPEL signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2018. Plaintiff's Opposition due within 21-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to dismiss certain claims and defendants re 19 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/6/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Regarding November 3, 2017 and November 13, 2017 Status Reports; ORDER DIRECTING Parties to File Further Joint Status Report within Thirty (30) Days,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/2017. (Case Management Deadline: 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Regarding Joint Statement Regarding Meet-and-Confer Conference and ORDER GRANTING Stay of Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Compel and Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/12/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER regarding Defendants' motion to compel, directing the parties to meet and confer 43 and vacating deadline for Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion to compel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/4/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 37 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/12/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order 29 , 35 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/19/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/8/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING 9 Motion for Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary and Temporary Restaining Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/2/2014. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Gipson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrick Jose Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Cribbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Henery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Casas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Southard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?