Harlow v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Karen D. Harlow
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv01881
Filed: November 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AFFIRMING Agency's Denial of Benefits and Orderding Judgment for Commissioner signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/6/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Time to File Responsive Brief; ORDER - defendant's response due by 11/12/2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/10/2014. (Herman, H)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule; ORDER Thereon - Plaintiff's Opening Brief by 9/12/2014; Defendant Oppostion by 10/13/2014; Plaintiff's Reply Brief by 10/20/2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/15/2014. (Herman, H)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/2013. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harlow v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen D. Harlow
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?