Crisp v. Wasco State Prison
Plaintiff: Obie Crisp
Defendant: Wasco State Prison
Case Number: 1:2013cv01899
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER CLOSING CASE Pursuant to Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice 87 , 88 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/30/17. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/29/16 ordering the Custodian to produce Obie Lee Crisp III. on 1/06/17 at 9:00 a.m. via video conferencing in courtroom 25 before Magistrate J udge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento and KJN)(Plummer, M)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part, Plaintiff's 72 Motion Regarding Transportation Writ for Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/6/16. (Gonzalez, R)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Obie Lee Crisp, CDCR# AL-6821, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/29/16. Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Verduzco, M)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions to Stay Action Pending Settlement Conference 66 , 67 , 70 , 71 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/29/16. (Verduzco, M)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/24/2016.( Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN), Sacramento, before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Replies to Defendants' Objections to the Findings and Recommendations to Deny their Motion for Summary Judgment Since Moot 61 62 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/3/16. (Verduzco, M)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/2/16. Deadline to Amend Pleadings: November 28, 2016, Discovery Deadline: January 30, 2017, Dispositive Motion Deadline: March 17, 2017. (Verduzco, M)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DISREGARDING Plaintiff's Motions for Extensions of Time to Conduct Discovery and to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Since Moot 47 , 49 , 51 , 52 , 54 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/30/16. (Hellings, J)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS DENYING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 34 , 56 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/28/16: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants' 34 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/30/2016. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 9/26/2016.(Flores, E)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 43 and 45 Motions for Stay of Action and to Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as Unnecessary, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/17/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER MODIFYING Scheduling Order Staying Action other than that Related to the Issue of Exhaustion and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/14/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER -- NOTICE and Warning Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/13/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Cisco Should Not be Dismissed Pursuant to Rule 4(m), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/24/15. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/25/15. (Verduzco, M)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/8/15: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 THIRD SCREENING ORDER (1) Dismissing Section 1983 Official Capacity Claims, Defendant Kelso, Equal Protection Claim, Count V, Unruh Act Claim, and Contract Claim, and (2) Authorizing Service of Third Amended Complaint on Eighth Amendedment, ADA, RA, and Neglicence Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/2/15. (Gonzalez, R)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying 16 Motion as Moot and Directing Clerk's Office to File Third Amended Complaint Received on November 21, 2014 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/25/2014. (Flores, E)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 13 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint as PREMATURE and DENYING 12 Motion for Leave to Submit Missing Page as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/19/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crisp v. Wasco State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obie Crisp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasco State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?