Forte v. Hughes et al
Plaintiff: Eugene E. Forte
Defendant: Tori Hughes, Chris Schwartz, Adam Christianson, Patterson Police Department and Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 1:2013cv01980
Filed: December 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION RECONSIDERATION signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 23, 2018. (ECF No. 155) (Munoz, I)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 21, 2018. (ECF No. 146)(Munoz, I)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 13, 2018. (ECF No. 146) (Munoz, I)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend 148 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/2/2018. (Hellings, J)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re Miscellaneous Ex Parte Applications 123 , 138 , 139 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/20/17. (Gonzalez, R)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER RE Plaintiff's 134 Motion signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/3/2017. (Status Conference set for March 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. before District Judge Dale A. Drozd)(Martin-Gill, S)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AMENDED 118 REQUEST for U.S. Attorney's Office to Prosecute 117 Criminal Contempt, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/25/2017. (The Court requests that the U.S. Attorney's Office inform the Court by 1/27/2017, whether it will prosecute this case and, if so, confirm attendance at the 2/13/2017 status conference.)(Gaumnitz, R)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REQUEST for U.S. Attorney's Office to Prosecute 117 Criminal Contempt, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/20/2017. (The Court requests that the U.S. Attorney's Office inform the Court by 1/27/2017, whether it will prosecute this case and, if so, confirm attendance at the 2/17/2017 status conference.)(Gaumnitz, R)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION (Doc. 113) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 17, 2017. (Munoz, I)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re Plaintiff's ExParte Application 108 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/3/17. (Gonzalez, R)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/21/16. Motions in Limine Filing Deadline: January 4, 2017; Motions in Limine Response Deadline: January 11, 2017; Motions in Limine Hearing set for 1/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial set for 2/7/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Verduzco, M)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application 99 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/16/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 87 Motion to Correct Prior Order, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/26/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RE Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application 85 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/25/16. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ORDERING Plaintiff's request for issuance of the subpoena attached as Exhibit 1 to document 76 DENIED without prejudice. The Court FURTHER ORDERS Plaintiff's request for issuance of ten signed, but otherwise blank, subpoenas DENIED, document 77 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/16/2016. (Rooney, M)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DIRECTING Personal Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Within Seven Days by United States Marshals Service Without Prepayment of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/23/2015. (Jessen, A)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 62 Plaintiff's ExParte Application Requesting Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Doctors Medical Center of Modesto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/14/15. (Gonzalez, R)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Amend Caption, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 03/02/15. (Gonzalez, R)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying Marshal's Motion for Reimbursement for Service of Defendant City of Patterson, re 49 , 50 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 02/11/15. (Gonzalez, R)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER SETTING a Mandatory Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/8/2015. (Rooney, M)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DISMISSING State Tort Claims (Counts 11, 12, 15, 16, and 17) Against Defendant City of Patterson, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/2/14. (Marrujo, C)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING State Tort Claims (Counts 7-18) 37 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/3/14: Defendants Stanislaus County, Patterson Police Services and the Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department are DISMISSED from this matter. Case remains as to Defendant Timothy Schwartz; Schwartz' answer due within 21 days of service of this order. (Hellings, J)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DIRECTING Service by the United States Marshals Service without Prepayment of Costs on Defendants: Stanislaus County Deputy Chris Schwartz; City of Patterson, Patterson Police Services and Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department,signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/20/14. (60-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER STRIKING Findings and Recommendations to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute (Doc. 33). Service documents in the above-entitled matter having been docketed by the Court (Doc. 34), the undersigned hereby STRIKES the findings and recommendations recommending that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute (Doc. 33). signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/20/2014. (Herman, H)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Reconsideration of the Order Denying Plaintiff's Request to Reopen the Period in which to Object to Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/3/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING plaintiff's Motion to Revoke His Prior Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, document 24 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/30/2014. (Rooney, M)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that lawsuit proceed following dismissal of certain claims and defendants. These findings and recommendations are referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill with objections due within fourteen days of service. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/27/2014. (Rooney, M)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING Motion to Appoint Counsel, document 12 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/23/2014. (Rooney, M)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/22/14. (Gonzalez, R)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING plaintiff to either file, within thirty days of service of this order, an amended complaint or notify the court of his willingness to proceed only on claims found to be cognizable. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/9/2014. (Rooney, M)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 3 Motion REQUEST TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/18/2013. (Kusamura, W)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/11/13. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forte v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene E. Forte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tori Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?