February 23, 2018 |
Filing
182
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION RECONSIDERATION signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 23, 2018. (ECF No. 155) (Munoz, I)
|
February 21, 2018 |
Filing
174
DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 21, 2018. (ECF No. 146)(Munoz, I)
|
February 13, 2018 |
Filing
160
DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 13, 2018. (ECF No. 146) (Munoz, I)
|
February 2, 2018 |
Filing
150
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend 148 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/2/2018. (Hellings, J)
|
September 20, 2017 |
Filing
141
ORDER re Miscellaneous Ex Parte Applications 123 , 138 , 139 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/20/17. (Gonzalez, R)
|
April 20, 2017 |
Filing
135
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER RE Plaintiff's 134 Motion signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
|
February 14, 2017 |
Filing
127
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/3/2017. (Status Conference set for March 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. before District Judge Dale A. Drozd)(Martin-Gill, S)
|
January 25, 2017 |
Filing
119
AMENDED 118 REQUEST for U.S. Attorney's Office to Prosecute 117 Criminal Contempt, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/25/2017. (The Court requests that the U.S. Attorney's Office inform the Court by 1/27/2017, whether it will prosecute this case and, if so, confirm attendance at the 2/13/2017 status conference.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
January 20, 2017 |
Filing
118
REQUEST for U.S. Attorney's Office to Prosecute 117 Criminal Contempt, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/20/2017. (The Court requests that the U.S. Attorney's Office inform the Court by 1/27/2017, whether it will prosecute this case and, if so, confirm attendance at the 2/17/2017 status conference.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
January 18, 2017 |
Filing
116
ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION (Doc. 113) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 17, 2017. (Munoz, I)
|
January 3, 2017 |
Filing
110
ORDER re Plaintiff's ExParte Application 108 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/3/17. (Gonzalez, R)
|
December 21, 2016 |
Filing
107
PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/21/16. Motions in Limine Filing Deadline: January 4, 2017; Motions in Limine Response Deadline: January 11, 2017; Motions in Limine Hearing set for 1/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial set for 2/7/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Verduzco, M)
|
December 16, 2016 |
Filing
101
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application 99 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/16/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
August 26, 2016 |
Filing
88
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 87 Motion to Correct Prior Order, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/26/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
July 25, 2016 |
Filing
86
ORDER RE Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application 85 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/25/16. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
February 16, 2016 |
Filing
78
ORDER ORDERING Plaintiff's request for issuance of the subpoena attached as Exhibit 1 to document 76 DENIED without prejudice. The Court FURTHER ORDERS Plaintiff's request for issuance of ten signed, but otherwise blank, subpoenas DENIED, document 77 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/16/2016. (Rooney, M)
|
October 26, 2015 |
Filing
66
ORDER DIRECTING Personal Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Within Seven Days by United States Marshals Service Without Prepayment of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/23/2015. (Jessen, A)
|
October 20, 2015 |
Filing
65
ORDER Granting 62 Plaintiff's ExParte Application Requesting Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Doctors Medical Center of Modesto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/14/15. (Gonzalez, R)
|
March 3, 2015 |
Filing
56
ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Amend Caption, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 03/02/15. (Gonzalez, R)
|
February 12, 2015 |
Filing
53
ORDER Denying Marshal's Motion for Reimbursement for Service of Defendant City of Patterson, re 49 , 50 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 02/11/15. (Gonzalez, R)
|
January 8, 2015 |
Filing
47
ORDER SETTING a Mandatory Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/8/2015. (Rooney, M)
|
December 3, 2014 |
Filing
46
ORDER DISMISSING State Tort Claims (Counts 11, 12, 15, 16, and 17) Against Defendant City of Patterson, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/2/14. (Marrujo, C)
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing
42
ORDER DISMISSING State Tort Claims (Counts 7-18) 37 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/3/14: Defendants Stanislaus County, Patterson Police Services and the Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department are DISMISSED from this matter. Case remains as to Defendant Timothy Schwartz; Schwartz' answer due within 21 days of service of this order. (Hellings, J)
|
August 21, 2014 |
Filing
36
ORDER DIRECTING Service by the United States Marshals Service without Prepayment of Costs on Defendants: Stanislaus County Deputy Chris Schwartz; City of Patterson, Patterson Police Services and Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department,signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/20/14. (60-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
35
ORDER STRIKING Findings and Recommendations to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute (Doc. 33). Service documents in the above-entitled matter having been docketed by the Court (Doc. 34), the undersigned hereby STRIKES the findings and recommendations recommending that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute (Doc. 33). signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/20/2014. (Herman, H)
|
August 4, 2014 |
Filing
31
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Reconsideration of the Order Denying Plaintiff's Request to Reopen the Period in which to Object to Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/3/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing
30
ORDER DENYING plaintiff's Motion to Revoke His Prior Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, document 24 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/30/2014. (Rooney, M)
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing
15
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that lawsuit proceed following dismissal of certain claims and defendants. These findings and recommendations are referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill with objections due within fourteen days of service. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/27/2014. (Rooney, M)
|
April 24, 2014 |
Filing
14
ORDER DENYING Motion to Appoint Counsel, document 12 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/23/2014. (Rooney, M)
|
January 22, 2014 |
Filing
11
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/22/14. (Gonzalez, R)
|
January 10, 2014 |
Filing
6
ORDER REQUIRING plaintiff to either file, within thirty days of service of this order, an amended complaint or notify the court of his willingness to proceed only on claims found to be cognizable. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/9/2014. (Rooney, M)
|
December 18, 2013 |
Filing
5
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 3 Motion REQUEST TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/18/2013. (Kusamura, W)
|
December 12, 2013 |
Filing
4
ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/11/13. (Verduzco, M)
|