Toscano et al v. City Of Fresno et al
Plaintiff: Angel Keith Toscano, Jr. and Cole Toscano
Defendant: City Of Fresno and Jerry Dyer
Case Number: 1:2013cv01987
Filed: December 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Steven Wade Toscano's Motion to Correct Clerical Error Pro Tunc; ORDER Vacating March 7, 2018 Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/01/2018. (Flores, E)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case 103 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/17: Case voluntarily closed, pursuant to Rule 41(a). (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Approving Minors' Compromise 83 , 86 , 87 , 88 , 89 , 91 , 93 , 96 , 97 , 100 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/15/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Vacating February 15, 2017 Hearing on Petition for Minor's Compromise and Requiring Plaintiff Steven Wade Toscano to File Amended Payout Amounts for Annuity Based on Corrected Net Balance, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/9/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REQUIRING MINOR PLAINTIFFS TO SUPPLEMENT PETITION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Steven Wade Toscano, Anthony Keith Toscano, Angel Infinity Toscano, and Julian Matthew Toscano shall file a supplement to address the expenses incurred in this action on or before February 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/3/2017. (Hernandez, M)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Requiring Steven Wade Toscano to File Fee Agreement Within Five Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/24/17. (Hellings, J)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING HEARING ON PETITIONS FOR MINORS COMPROMISE. The MOTION HEARING is RESET to 2/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/2017. (Hernandez, M)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for minor Plaintiffs Anthony Keith Toscano, Julian Matthew Toscano, Angel Infinity Toscano, and Jimmy Lee Longs failure to comply with the December 14, 2016 order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/5/2017. Show Cause Response due by 1/13/2017. (Rosales, O)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISREGARDING STEVEN WADE TOSCANO'S PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE AND DIRECTING MINOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A PETITION FOR MINORS COMPROMISE WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS (ECF No. 81): Plaintiff Steven Wade Toscano's petition for minor' ;s compromise is DISREGARDED; and within fourteen (14) days of the date of service of this order, the minor Plaintiffs shall file a petition for minor's compromise that complies with Local Rule 202. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/14/2016. (Valdez, E)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 28, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/18/2016. (Hernandez, M)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT BY AUGUST 15, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/9/2016. (Hernandez, M)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT EVERY NINETY DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/2016. (Hernandez, M)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER STAYING ACTION signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 64 Petition to Certify Defendants' Appeal as Frivolous and Directing the Office of the Clerk to Serve a Copy of this Order on the Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit re 64 , 65 , 68 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/19/15. (Gonzalez, R)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/24/2015. (Rosales, O)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal of Chief Jerry Dyer and Officer and Kenneth Webb with Prejudice from this Action Entirely and Dismissal of the City of Fresno as to the Monell Claims only signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/15/2015. (Flores, E)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER requiring plaintiffs to file Notice of Dismissal within 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/2015. (Hernandez, M)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request to vacate the settlement conference currently set before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/28/2015. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/14/2015. (Rooney, M)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/6/2015. (Timken, A)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Regarding Substitution of Counsel 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/13/14. Attorney Martin Taleisnik terminated. (Verduzco, M)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/14. Attorneys Michael Goldberg and Russell Charles Sahlin added for Plaintiffs, Anthony Keith Toscano, Julian Matthew Toscano, Angel Infinity Toscano, and Jimmy Lee Long. (Verduzco, M)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re Stipulation to Consent to Transfer Entire Case to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone for all Purposes, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/30/14. New Case Number: 1:13-cv-01987-SAB. (Verduzco, M)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to Consolidate for all Purposes Pursuant to Stipulation, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/20/14. Lead Case: 1:13-cv-01987-LJO-SKO. Member Case: 1:14-cv-00186-LJO-SKO. (Verduzco, M)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem Kimberly Henson for Steven Wade Toscano signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/12/2014. (Flores, E)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Appoint ad Litem. Kimberly Henson is appointed as the guardian ad litem for Plaintiff Cole Toscano. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/27/2013. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toscano et al v. City Of Fresno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Keith Toscano, Jr.
Represented By: John Laurence Rozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cole Toscano
Represented By: John Laurence Rozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?