Lopez v. Allison et al
Plaintiff: Adam Lopez
Defendant: K. Allison, Kent Clark, William J. Sullivan, D. Foster, D. Artis, A. Hernandez, T. Wan, S. Sherman, R. Diaz, F. Vasquez, R. Tolsen, D. Goss, C. Moreno, O. Yabarra, M. Bejarano, C. Garza, D. Johnson, R. Gomez and S. Zinani
Case Number: 1:2013cv02010
Filed: December 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Close this Action signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/07/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Directing Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's 58 MOTION to COMPEL Filed February 21, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/17. Response Due Within Twenty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate Adam Lopez, CDCR# J-27394, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Thirty Day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Requests for Production 48 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/12/16: Deadline EXTENDED to 9/12/2016. (Hellings, J)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 44 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/12/2016. (Fahrney, E)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 26 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; and ORDER Directing Defendants to File an Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/9/2016. (Jessen, A)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny 26 Defendants Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/27/16. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Plaintiff's Request for Clarification re Pleading Practice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/26/16. (Gonzalez, R)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration of Order denying appointment of counsel signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/16/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 26 ; ORDER Granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/3/15. 60-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/16/13. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Allison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Tolsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Yabarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bejarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Zinani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?