Estate of Stephen E. Crawley et al v. Kings County et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Stephen E. Crawley, Norma Crawley and Johnny Crawley
Defendant: Kings County, Kings County Sheriff's Department and Dave Robinson
Case Number: 1:2013cv02042
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Stipulated Dismissal and ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/20/16. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and ORDER to vacate the November 20, 2015, settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Oberto in light of the Parties' desire to mediate this action. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/19/2015. (Timken, A)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Trial, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/16/2015. Final Pretrial Conference currently set for 9/25/2015 is moved to 1/21/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and the Jury Trial currently set for 10/14/2015 is moved to 3/8/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Kusamura, W)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. This version corrects purely typographic errors and supersedes the previous version 97 . Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/14/15. (Coffman, Lisa)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM DECISION ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/14/15. (Coffman, Lisa)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Re Costs and Attorneys Fees Associated with Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/24/2015. (Hernandez, M)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/6/2015. (Timken, A)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING Movant's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/22/2015. (Kusamura, W)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATED DISMISSAL and ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/9/2015. Defendants, Kings County and Kings County Sheriff's Department are dismissed with prejudice.(Lundstrom, T)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/26/2015. (Hernandez, M)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER Amending the Scheduling Order to Extend the Time for Designation of Expert Witnesses and Rule 26 Reports, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2015. (Kusamura, W)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 37 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/6/2015. (Hernandez, M)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL. The Court set the 37 MOTION to COMPEL for Deposition Testimony and Document Production as to Lemoore Police Department for a Motion Hearing for 5/6/2015 in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/22/2015. (Hernandez, M)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/29/2014. (Hernandez, M)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Adopting 27 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and PARTIALLY GRANTING Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/19/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/23/2014 recommending that 18 MOTION to DISMISS be partially granted. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 6/9/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER that defendants' response will now be due within 20 days of the service and filing of plaintiffs anticipated amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/27/2014. (Hernandez, M)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 3 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/17/13. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Stephen E. Crawley et al v. Kings County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Stephen E. Crawley
Represented By: William L Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Crawley
Represented By: William L Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Crawley
Represented By: William L Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?