Sokolsky v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Mark S. Sokolsky
Defendant: State of California, Christine Mativo, Rebecca Domrese, Audrey King, Alan Carlson, Brian Bowley, Marisa Bigot and Kamala Harris
Case Number: 1:2013cv02044
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING Substitution of Attorneys; ORDER for Clerk to Reflect That Plaintiff is Proceeding Pro Se, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/29/18. (Marrujo, C)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be Dismissed based on Plaintiff's failure to obey the Court's Order of August 17, 2017; re 30 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Mark S. Sokolsky ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/8/18. Objections to F&R due by 1/25/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER VACATING Findings and Recommendations Entered on September 21, 2017 85 ; THIRTY DAY DEADLINE to File Opposition or Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/31/17. (Hellings, J)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER STRIKING 87 Objections for Lack of Appropriate Signature; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Twenty Days in which to File New Objections Bearing his Handwritten Signature; Twenty-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be Dismissed based on Plaintiff's Failure to Obey the Court's Order of August 17, 2017 84 ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/21/17. Objections to F&R due (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment within Twenty (20) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/17/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DISCHARGING 79 Order to Show Cause; ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Rebecca Domrese from this Action; ORDER for Clerk to Reflect Dismissal of Defendant Domrese on the Court's Docket signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Service by the Court and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Stay re 72 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/6/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT REBECCA DOMRESE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT SERVICE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/7/2017. Show Cause Response due by 7/31/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER vacating hearing on 61 Motion for Summary Judgment from Court's Calendar signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Clarifying Plaintiff's Claims and Permitting Further Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/28/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Objections within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/4/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/3/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 62 Second Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment, Nunc Pro Tunc; ORDER EXTENDING Deadline for Parties to File Dispositive Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/31/17. New Dispositive Motions Filing Deadline: March 31, 2017. (Marrujo, C)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 55 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; ORDER EXTENDING Deadline for Parties to File Dispositive Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/21/16. New Dispositive Motions filed by 1/30/2017. (Marrujo, C)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Punitive Sanctions 49 , 54 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/31/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/27/2016 denying 44 Request for more definitive answer as moot. (Lundstrom, T)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER EXTENDING Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendants King and Porter, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/30/2016. (Marrujo, C)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER for Defendant: Audrey King and Jeannie Porter to SHOW CAUSE within (10) Days why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file an answer; ORDERED that Defendants Winthrow and Coyne be DISMISSED from the action; ORDER re 35 Motion for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 05/24/2016. ( Show Cause Response (10) Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 36 Request to Correct Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/20/16. (Marrujo, C)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/11/16: Defendants Coyne, Winthrow, Meeks, and Bonsu are DIRECTED to file an answer within ten (10) days of the date of service of this order. Failure to comply with the Court's order may result in sanctions. (Hellings, J)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Substitute Proper Parties as Defendants and Motion to File Second Amended Complaint; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Substitute Parties and File Lodged Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/4/16. (Marrujo, C)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Default 22 , 23 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/5/16. (Hellings, J)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION Recommending Plaintiff's Motion To Enter Default Be Denied (ECF No. 22 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/9/2015. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/28/2015 (Fahrney, E)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Adopting Findings And Recommendation (ECF No. 16 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/12/2015. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Findings and Recommendations, filed August 18, 2015, are ADOPTED in full. This action is ORDERED to proceed on the following claims: (1) violation of Plaintiffs First Amendment rights to free exercise of religion by Defendants Mativo, Domrese, King, Bowley, and Bigot; (2) violation of RLUIPA by Defendants Mativo, Domrese, King, Bowley, and Bigot ; and (3) violation of Plaintiffs substantive due process rights by Defendants King, Mativo, and Domrese for conditions of confinement. The remaining claims, as well as Defendants State of California, Alan Carlson, and Kamala Harris, are DISMISSED from this action.(Fahrney, E)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WILLINGNESS TO PROCEED ON COGNIZABLE CLAIMS re 15 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/18/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/4/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Motion For Temporary Appointment Of Judges (ECF No. 12 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/11/2015. (Fahrney, E)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Expedite Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/13/2014. (Marrujo, C)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/20/13. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sokolsky v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S. Sokolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Mativo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Domrese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Bigot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?