Marentes v. Key Energy Services California, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rene Marentes
Defendant: Key Energy Services California, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02067
Filed: December 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close this Case Due to the Stipulation of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/13/17. CASE CLOSED.(Gonzalez, R)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Torres Action Should Not Be Dismissed and Why the Matters Should Not Be Consolidated, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/24/2015. Show Cause Response due by 3/17/2015. (Hall, S)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REOPENING Case and WITHDRAWING Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 16 ; ORDER STRIKING Motion for Reconsideration as MOOT 18 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 5 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/23/15: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Remand signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/28/2014. CASE REMANDED to Kern County Superior Court. Certified Copy of remand order sent to Kern County Superior Court. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/5/2014. Hearing on Motion to Remand 5 CONTINUED to 2/12/2014 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marentes v. Key Energy Services California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Marentes
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Douglas Han
Represented By: Jill Jessica Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Energy Services California, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara J. Miller
Represented By: Jason S. Mills
Represented By: Maria D. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?