Brown v. Gipson et al

Plaintiff: William E. Brown
Defendant: Connie Gipson, J. D. Wilson, A. Guzman, E. Castro, S. Weiber, W. Rasley, J. Gonzales, T. Marsh, Sacedo, A. Scalfe and G. Miere
Case Number: 1:2013cv02084
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 93 ORDER adopting 85 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting Defendant's 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDER directing Clerk of Court to enter judgment and close case signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/26/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 89 ORDER DENYING 88 Motion to Compel Discovery; ORDERING Plaintiff's Objections to the August 23, 2018 findings and recommendations, if any, are due within fourteen (14) Days of this order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/18. (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for the Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 61 is Granted ; referred to Judge Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/23/2018. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 84 ORDER Denying 81 Motion to Alter or Amend a Previous Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/14/2018. (Flores, E)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 83 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 80 Motion seeking status report, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/8/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 79 ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendations and dismissing certain Defendants 26 , 53 , 66 , 67 , 71 , 72 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/2/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 74 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 62 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/6/2018. (Jessen, A)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 65 ORDER VACATING the January 10, 2018 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion 64 for Extension of Time to File Objections to the Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/2/18. (Marrujo, C)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 63 ORDER ADOPTING 53 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Defendants: Gipson, Gonzales, Guzman, and the John Doe; ORDERED that this matter be referred back to assigned Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 01/10/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order 60 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to File Rand Notice, Motion in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Request for Judicial Notice, Motion for Expert Witness and Appointment of Counsel, and Motion for Subpoena 54 , 55 , 56 , 58 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/18/2017: Motions are DENIED. (Hellings, J)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/12/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 12/29/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 48 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Appoint Counsel, without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/19/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 44 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/11/2017. Settlement Conference set for 10/24/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Flores, E)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 37 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of May 22, 2017 Order Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants re 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/16/17. (Gonzalez, R)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order 30 ORDER STAYING CASE and REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Status Report; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Update Plaintiff's Address of Record; Ninety (90) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/8/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order 22 ORDER denying 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/16/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR RECONSIDERATION re 11 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/16/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as Moot; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Court Hearing as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/13/2014. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Gipson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Weiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Rasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Scalfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Miere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?