Hazeltine v. Hicks et al
Plaintiff: Rick A. Hazeltine
Defendant: Frances Hicks, Aldo Mendez, Ian Young, Benjamin Gamez, RaShaun Casper, Julius Oldan, Porfirio Sanchez Negrete, David Avilia and Charles Ho
Case Number: 1:2014cv00056
Filed: January 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 178 Request for Copy of Transcripts at Government Expense signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/18/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 174 Motion for a New Trial signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/07/2018. (Flores, E)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 JUDGMENT dated *8/10/2018* in favor of defendants and against plaintiff according to the jury verdicts returned in open court on 8/10/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Gaumnitz, R)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE and ORDER That Stephen Arnold, CDCR# 607-2, is no Longer Needed as a Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/8/2018.(Gaumnitz, R)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION OFPLAINTIFF FOR TRIAL ON AUGUST 8, 2018, AT 8:30 A.M. signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/7/2018. (Thorp, J)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 151 Request to Seal signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/1/18. (Marrujo, C)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 135 136 Motions, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/30/18. (Marrujo, C)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's 124 MOTION to COMPEL signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/20/2018. (Defendant's Response due 7/27/2018). (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE AND ORDER that inmate witness is no longer needed as witness in these proceedings and the 111 Writ of Habeas Corpus is discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/19/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Reopening Discovery, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/2/18. Discovery due by 7/31/2018. (Gonzalez, R)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING In Part Plaintiff's 96 Motion for the Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses at Trial, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/14/18. (Marrujo, C)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Rick Hazeltine, ID# CO-000150-3 for Settlement Conference on July 19, 2018 at 1:00 p.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/03/2018. (Flores, E)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 100 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER for Plaintiff to Provide Additional Information within Twenty (20) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/22/2018. Filing Deadline: 6/14/2018.(Flores, E)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING 93 95 Motions to Appoint Counsel and Addressing Plaintiff's Allegations of Judicial Bias signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/3/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 96 Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/11/2018. (Flores, E)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's 92 Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/15/2018. (Flores, E)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court whether a Settlement Conference would be Beneficial,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/8/18. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motions to Compel as moot 71 , 74 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/8/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Re-Opening Discovery, for Limited Purpose of Allowing Plaintiff to File Motion to Compel, as Instructed by this Order; ORDER Extending Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadline for all Parties signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/08/2017. (Flores, E)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Declining to Adopt 60 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/17/17. Referred back to Magistrate Judge. 53 Motion for Summary Judgment Denied. (Gonzalez, R)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Denying Request for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/27/2017. (Flores, E)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING Motion to Declare a Conflict of Interest 55 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/13/17. (Hellings, J)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Declare a Confict of Interest within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/29/16. (Verduzco, M)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, filed on September 23, 2016, be GRANTED; Summary Judgment be GRANTED In Favor of Defendants Young, Gamez, Casper, Oldan, Negrete, Avilia, Smith and Ho; Clerk be DIRECTED to enter Judgment In Favor of Defendants an Close this case re 53 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ;referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/21/2016. Objections to F&R due (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING 42 Plaintiff's Request to Strike; ORDER RESOLVING Plaintiff's 52 Objections; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's 57 Motion to Stay, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/12/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/27/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Reconsideration of Denial of Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/29/16. (Gonzalez, R)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING Stipulated Request to Modify Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/24/2016. Discovery Cut-Off: 7/25/2016; Dispositive Motions Deadline: 9/23/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying 42 Request to Modify Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 05/11/2016. (Flores, E)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 32 Stipulated Request to Modify Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/21/2016. Discovery due by 3/24/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/24/2016. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/21/2015. (Flores, E)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding 27 First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/17/2015, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/23/2015. Frances Hicks and Aldo Mendez terminated from action. (Flores, E)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Willingness to Proceed on Cognizable Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/03/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 3/20/2015. (Flores, E)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/4/14. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazeltine v. Hicks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick A. Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldo Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RaShaun Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julius Oldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porfirio Sanchez Negrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Avilia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?