Oliver v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Oliver
Defendant: Darryl Adams, Matthew Cate, R. Davis, F.P. Field, A. El-Amin, E. Eburuche, Y. Carron, N. Grannis and K. Kostecky
Case Number: 1:2014cv00088
Filed: January 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case; Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/25/2018. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Directing Counsel Michael S. Romano to Submit a Substitution of Attorney as Required by Local Rule 182(g) within Twenty-One Days from the Date of Service of this Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/12/2018. (Flores, E)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 68 Request for Modification of the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/27/17. Amend Pleadings Deadline: 1/19/2018, Discovery due by 3/20/2018., Dispositive Motions filed by 6/1/2018. (Gonzalez, R)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant Grannis's Motion to Dismiss 57 , 62 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/30/17: 20-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant Grannis's Motion to Dismiss 57 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/14/17: 30-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Adopting 54 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' 37 Motion to Dismiss, and DENYING Plaintiff's 50 Motion to File an Amended Complaint signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/3/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER as to Why Entry of Default Should Not be Entered as to Defendant Grannis, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/23/16. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 37 and Plaintiff's MOtion to Amend the Complaint 50 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/22/16. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DISMISSAL of Certain Claims and Defendants for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief, and REFERRING the Matter Back to the Magistrate Judge for Initiation of Service of Process 26 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/21/15. (Hellings, J)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/7/2015, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.P. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. El-Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Eburuche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Carron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Kostecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?