Clymore, et al v. Federal Railroad Administration et al
Plaintiff: Richard Clymore and Debra Harbin-Clymore
Defendant: Federal Railroad Administration and Charles Mark Hagood
Case Number: 1:2014cv00101
Filed: January 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER on Exparte Application to Reopen, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/7/2016. (Kusamura, W)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/25/2016. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING defendants' Motion to Compel, document 40 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/2/2015. (Rooney, M)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order, document 41 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/6/2015. (Rooney, M)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING 42 Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Collateral Estoppel; ORDER VACATING October 5, 2015, Hearing; and ORDER SUBSTITUTING the United States as Defendant in Place of Federal Railroad Administration and Charles Mark Hagood signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/29/2015. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of pretrial dates as follows: Non-Expert Discovery due by 10/30/2015; Expert Discovery due by 4/1/2016; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/20/2015; Supplemental Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/18/2015; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 12/4/2015; and Dispositive Motions filed by 4/8/2016. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/20/2015. (Rooney, M)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER following telephonic discovery dispute. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/25/2015. (Rooney, M)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/8/2015. (Rosales, O)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Request for a Jury Trial, document 8 . Orders signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/3/2014. (Rooney, M)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on Stipulation to Withdraw Allegations of Negligent Entrustment From Count One, Without Prejudice, and Withdraw Count Two of Plaintiffs' Complaint Without Prejudice, and Take Defendant's 9 Motion to Dismiss Off Calendar Without Prejudice, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/3/2014.(Gaumnitz, R)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER vacating hearing date of May 19, 2014 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/15/14. (Nazaroff, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clymore, et al v. Federal Railroad Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Clymore
Represented By: Brian J. Panish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Harbin-Clymore
Represented By: Brian J. Panish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Railroad Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Mark Hagood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?