Jacobsen v. People of the State of California
Plaintiff: Michael Neil Jacobsen
Defendant: People of the State of California
Case Number: 1:2014cv00108
Filed: January 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Granting Sergeant Diaz and Officer Barajas' Motions for Summary Judgment 114 , 116 ; ORDER Directing Clerk to Close, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/1/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause and GRANTING Plaintiff One, Final Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 126 , 127 and 128 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/19/17. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S) Modified on 10/19/2017 (Martin-Gill, S). (Forwarded: Doc(s) 114 , 116 , 16 and 102 to Plaintiff)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With the Court's Order and for Failure to Prosecute 119 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/23/17: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING Nurse Monica Choe's Motion for Summary Judgment 109 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/18/17:Defendant Nurse Monica Choe and all claims against her are DISMISSED with prejudice; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendant Nurse Choe and reflect her termination on the docket for this case. (Hellings, J)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING 95 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Due to Spoilation of Video Evidence signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/20/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/12/17. 21-Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/02/2017. (Flores, E)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 105 Discovery Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/7/17. (Gonzalez, R)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER on Plaintiff's Discovery Motions (re 84 , 85 & 89 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/17. (Marrujo, C)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 AMENDED ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition; Disregarding Defendant's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories as Moot; Denying Defendant's Request for Sanctions; Denying Defendant's Motion to Enforce Court Order; Denying Defendant's Motion for Dismissal; and Granting Defendant's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order 70 , 75 , 81 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/29/16. (Marrujo, C)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING 90 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/27/16. (Marrujo, C)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for X-Rays & Cat Scan and Plaintiff's Motion for a "24 Hour Cruise Waiver" for Lack of Jurisdiction 88 , 94 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/22/16. (Verduzco, M)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant Choe's Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/2/16. 21-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING In Part and DENYING In Part Plaintiff's 53 Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/9/2015. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Requiring Defendant Nurse Monica Choe to File a Response to the Marshal's Request for Reimbursement of Costs of Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/10/15. 20-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 THIRD AMENDED DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/15. Discovery Cut-Off Deadline: 7/22/2016; Dispositive Motion Deadline: 8/22/2016. (Verduzco, M)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 47 Defendants' Motion to Strike 44 Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint and Denying Plaintiff's 50 Request for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/29/15. (Gonzalez, R)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Outside Examination and Access to a Copy Machine, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/10/2015. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobsen v. People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Neil Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?