King v. Deathriage et al
Plaintiff: Micheal Steven King
Defendant: S. Deathriage, A. Montano, R. Briones, P.D. Brazelon, I. Martinez and E. Angulo
Case Number: 1:2014cv00111
Filed: January 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER THAT INMATE MICHAEL STEVEN KING, CDCR #F-27519, IS NO LONGER NEEDED AS A PARTICIPANT IN THESE PROCEEDINGS, AND THE WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM IF DISCHARGED 100 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/23/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting Defendants' 97 Motion to Allow Defendant Deathriage to Testify at Trial by Video Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/17. (Gonzalez, R)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT INMATE, FRIZZELL BELL, CDCR # V-98376 a witness for Plaintiff, on July 11, 2017 at 8:00 a.m. for a Jury Trial in Courtroom No. 9, 6th Floor before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/14/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO ALLOW TRIAL PARTICIPATION BY VIDEO CONFERENCE AND DIRECTING CLERK TO EMAIL COPY OF ORDER TO LITIGATION COORDINATOR signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/12/2017. Hearing set for 6/20/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone along with telephonic trial confirmation. (Lundstrom, T)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC TRIAL CONFIRMATION HEARING DATE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2017. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 6/20/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Lundstrom, T).
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER OVERRULING 94 Objection to Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Continue Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/15/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE 77 , OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS REGARDING TRIAL EXHIBITS 91 , ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE 79 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/11/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Directing Transport of Inmate Michael Steven King, CDCR #F-27519; ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Serve Order by E-Mail on Ironwood State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/27/2017. (Flores, E)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL / MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER 81 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/25/2017. Hearing set for 4/27/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Lundstrom, T)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT MICHAEL STEVEN KING, CDC No. F-27519 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/19/2017. Trial scheduled for 5/16/2017 at 8:00 a.m. in Court Room No. 4, 7th Floor before Cheif Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Lundstrom, T)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER overruling Plaintiff's 74 Objections to pretrial order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/14/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER to Warden of Ironwood State Prison Regarding Inmate Micheal Steven King, CDCR #F-27519 and ORDER Directing Clerk to E-mail Copy of Order to Litigation Coordinator signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/23/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/17/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within 10-Days why terminating sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Court's Scheduling Order 47 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/1/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RESETTING TRIAL DATE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/11/2017. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Sant Agata, S)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING Second 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/1/2016. Jury Trial RESET for 5/9/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Jessen, A)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING 44 Findings and Recommendation; ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' 41 Motion Summary Judgment, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/22/16. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING 41 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/2016. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/12/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR PEACE OFFICER RECORDS re 32 , 38 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/19/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING 31 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/7/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER STRIKING 26 Plaintiff's Request From Court Record signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/25/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 19 Request to initiate further service of process as moot signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/16/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 22 Defendants' Request to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment and ORDER WITHDRAWING 17 Motion for Summary Judgment From Court's Calendar signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/7/2015. (Jessen, A)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Dismissing Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/8/14. P.D. Brazelon and A. Montano dismissed.(Verduzco, M)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Motion (Doc. 6 ), ORDER Directing Clerk To Correct The Spelling Of Defendant Deathriage's Name On The Court Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/5/2014. Plaintiffs motion filed on February 4, 2014, is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to make a correction to the spelling of defendant Deathriages name on the court record, from J. Deathriage to S. Deathriage. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Deathriage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Deathriage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Briones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D. Brazelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Angulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Steven King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?