Western Reserve Life Assurance Company of Ohio v. Heinrich, et al.
Plaintiff: Western Reserve Life Assurance Company of Ohio
Defendant: Suzette Heinrich, Janet Aldrich, Christopher Pitcher and Richard Pitcher
Case Number: 1:2014cv00137
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SECOND AMENDED ORDER for Discharge re 48 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/9/2015. (Martinez, A)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED ORDER for Discharge signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/9/2015. (Martinez, A)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER for Discharge, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/3/15. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference Procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/18/2015. (Martinez, A)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice of Errata and Request for Correction of Clerical Error in Order 24 ; ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/28/14. (Verduzco, M)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER for Discharge and Dismissal With Prejudice of Plaintiff Western Reserve Life Insurance Company of Ohio, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/24/14: The Clerk of Court is directed not to close this case. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Reserve Life Assurance Company of Ohio v. Heinrich, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Reserve Life Assurance Company of Ohio
Represented By: Adrienne C. Publicover
Represented By: Dennis J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzette Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Aldrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Pitcher
Represented By: Jennifer Janet Lothert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pitcher
Represented By: Jennifer Janet Lothert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?