Coston v. Clark et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Murphy Coston
Defendant: E Clark, Conall McCabe, Jeffery Wang, Teresa Macias and D. Zamora
Case Number: 1:2014cv00148
Filed: January 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 58 Motion for Reconsideration and REAFFIRMING Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations; Case to Remain CLOSED signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/9/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Summary Judgment and Grant Summary Judgment for Defendant signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/26/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. (Flores, E)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendant's Motion for Leave to Issue Subpoenas, File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion and File a Motion for Summary Judgment 49 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/19/17: 21-Day Deadline for issuance of subpoena; 60-Day Deadline to file a motion for summary judgment. (Hellings, J)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER (1) VACATING Order to Show Cause; and (2) GRANTING Defendant's Rule 56(d) Request signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/24/2017. Defendant is hereby granted an additional sixty (60) days from the date of this Order in which to conduct discovery. (Jessen, A)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/05/2017. (Flores, E)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Second Request to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order 41 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/23/17. (Hellings, J)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline re 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/27/17. Dispositive Motion Deadline: 4/11/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (1) DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend; and (2) DENYING Defendant's Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order 31 , 34 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/15/2017. (Hellings, J)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Strike 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/16/16: Plaintiff's TAC 27 is STRICKEN. (Hellings, J)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/18/15. (Verduzco, M)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed With Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/15/15. Show Cause Response Due Within Fourteen Days.(Marrujo, C)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:14-cv-0249 KJN PC) to Fresno (1:14-cv-0148 MJS PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/4/2014; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coston v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Murphy Coston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conall McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?