Rocha v ConAgra Foods Packaged Foods, LLC
Plaintiff: Natalia Rocha
Defendant: ConAgra Foods Packaged Foods, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00154
Filed: February 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/19/15: Case is dismissed with prejudice; The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case as this order terminates this case in its entirety. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting Parties' Joint Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Conference Order (Dkt. 27) and to Continue Hearing on Union Pacific Railroad's Motion for Judgment on the Pleading (Dkt. 31) (Doc. 34). The parties stipulation to modify the Scheduling Conference Order and to continue the hearing on Union Pacifics Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 34) is GRANTED. The hearing on Union Pacifics Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 31) currently set for February 4, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. will now be held on March 27, 2015, at 9:00 a.m.. Additionally, the Scheduling Conference Order is hereby modified as follows: (1) Initial expert witness disclosures: March 19, 2015; (2) Supplemental expert witness disclosures: April 6, 2015; (3) Non-expert discovery cut-off: April 3, 2015; (4) Expert discovery cut-off: April 30, 2015. The parties are cautioned that the remaining deadlines and all other orders contained in the scheduling order issue d on June 25, 2014 (Doc. 27) remain in full force and effect. In particular, the Court is not inclined to move the deadline for filing pretrial motions which is May 4, 2015, and the deadlines for the pretrial conference and trial which are set for July 14, 2015, and September 1, 2015 respectively. The parties shall plan accordingly. Finally, the Court notes the parties indicate settlement negotiations are underway. The parties are reminded that a settlement conference can be arranged, if both parties believe a court settlement conference would be beneficial, by calling Courtroom Deputy Harriet Herman at (559) 499-5788. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/27/2015. (Herman, H)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to recaption case signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/6/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER To DISMISS Without Prejudice Defendant Conagra Foods Packaged Foods, LLC Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Docs. 13 & 17 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/1/2014. (Fahrney, E)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Vacate Hearing signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/04/2014. Response to Amended Complaint due by 3/25/2014.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocha v ConAgra Foods Packaged Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Rocha
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Niermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConAgra Foods Packaged Foods, LLC
Represented By: Laura Elaine Coombe
Represented By: Susan Lynn Germaise
Represented By: Angela M. Spivey, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?