Linenbroker v. ITT Educational Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scott Linenbroker
Defendant: ITT Educational Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00207
Filed: February 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER on Stipulation for Dismissal of Action, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/6/15: This action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING Motion to Strike and Requesting Supplemental Briefing re 23 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/23/2014. (Jessen, A)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER RE Filing of Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/17/2014. (Martinez, A)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference Procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/29/2014. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linenbroker v. ITT Educational Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Linenbroker
Represented By: John Lawrence Migliazzo
Represented By: Michael J. F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Educational Services, Inc.
Represented By: David R. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?