St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. Centex Homes, et al
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Defendant: Centex Homes and Centex Real Estate Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv00244
Filed: February 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/04/2016. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order to modify scheduling order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/20/2016. (Non expert Discovery due by 11/3/2016; Expert Disclosure due by 11/3/2016; Expert Discovery due by 12/16/2016; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 12/16/2016; Dispositive Motions filed by 1/30/2017; Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2017 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial set for 5/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill) (Rosales, O)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Withdrawing Centex's Answer and Counterclaim and Setting Briefing Schedule signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/8/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Re Plaintiffs' Motion For Reconsideration (Doc. 32 ) Of Memorandum Decision And ORDER (Doc. 25 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/16/2014. (Fahrney, E)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order GRANTING joint stipulation to extend time to file status report by one week, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/13/2014. (Joint Status Report: 9/24/2014)(Figueroa, O)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER after the Status Conference DIRECTING the parties to file a joint statement addressing the areas outlined in this Order, to be filed no later than 9/17/2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/5/2014. (Rooney, M)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 21 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 4, 2014. Motion Hearing currently set for 8/13/2014 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON CENTEXS MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 , 14 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/17/2014. (Motion filing deadline: 7/2/2014, Opposition filing deadline 7/21/2014 , Reply filing deadline: 7/30/2014, Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset for 8/13/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Scheduling Conference reset for 8/27/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin). (Lundstrom, T)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM Decision and ORDER re Defendant's 12 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/20/2014. Plaintiffs Shall File Any Amended Complaint Within 20 Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/14/2014. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/27/2014 is CONTINUED to 7/29/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.(Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. Centex Homes, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Kari Marie Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Homes
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Real Estate Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?