Green v. Delgado et al
Plaintiff: Eric W. Green
Defendant: O Delgado, J. Ramirez, J Gonzales and H Ortega
Case Number: 1:2014cv00297
Filed: March 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 77 Request for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/16/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 60 , 61 , 65 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/21/15: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/4/15. (Hellings, J)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER 55 re: Discovery Issues Related to Subpoena and Site Inspection, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/10/2015. (Hall, S)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order Extending Deadline for Amendment of Pleadings and Granting Leave for Defendants to File Amended Answers 35 , 38 , 39 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/20/15. Deadline to File Amended Pleadings: May 22, 2015.(Verduzco, M)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Appointment of Counsel and to File Future Funding Requests Under Seal 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/21/15. (Hellings, J)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING Ex Parte Request to Seal Lodged Documents; ORDER DISREGARDING Lodged Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/26/2014. (Hall, S)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Approving 15 Stipulation Extending Time for Responsive Pleading 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/30/14. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Delgado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric W. Green
Represented By: Sarah Lou Ann Garvey
Represented By: Kevin Gerard Little
Represented By: Darrell York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?