Harring v. Martens
Plaintiff: David Harring
Defendant: Christopher Martens
Case Number: 1:2014cv00310
Filed: November 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CLOSING CASE in Light of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/23/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Screening First Amended Complaint and Recommending Dismissal of this Action Without Leave to Amend and Closing Case (ECF No. 11). Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 15 days after the date of this Findings and Recommendation, the parties may file written objections with the Court. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/2014. (Herman, H)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DEEMING First Amended Complaint Timely Filed signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/1/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that that this action be DISMISSED for Plaintiffs' failure to comply with a Court Order and that the Clerk of the Court be DIRECTED to Close this action re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by David Harring ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/14. Objections to F&R due by 7/14/2014 (Martin-Gill, S)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/4/14 TRANSFERRING case to the Fresno Division. New case number 1:14-cv-0310 AWI BAM (PS). (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harring v. Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?