Anderson v. Gonzales et al
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Anderson
Defendant: A. Gonzales and C. Laita
Case Number: 1:2014cv00362
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Regarding Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal, With Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/22/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Requiring Parties to File Dispositional Documents and Vacating All Pending Dates and Matters, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/18/18. Fourteen Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Regarding 61 Plaintiff's Notice to the Court Regarding Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/16/2018. (Jessen, A)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Joseph E. Anderson, CDCR# T-48115 on June 18, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. at United States Courthouse, 2500 Tulare Street, Fresno, California in Courtroom #9, 6th Floor, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/24/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 6/18/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/24/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER to recaption case signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/3/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING IN PART 45 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER GRANTING 36 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/29/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 36 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/28/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 8/17/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 Defendants' Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order and ORDER VACATING the Scheduling Order 34 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/30/2016. (Jessen, A)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 29 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/23/2016. (Jessen, A)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be DENIED re 11 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/18/2016. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Gonzales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Laita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?