JK Communications & Construction, Inc. v. MP Nexlevel of CA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JK Communications & Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Western Surety Company, MP Nexlevel of CA, Inc. and CVIN, LLC
Cross_claimant: Western Surety Company and MP Nexlevel of CA, Inc.
Cross_defendant: CVIN, LLC
Counter_claimant: Western Surety Company and MP Nexlevel of CA, Inc.
Counter_defendant: JK Communications & Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00390
Filed: March 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER on Stipulation and Order to Remand Case to the California State Court 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/21/14. (CASE CLOSED) (Hellings, J)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Motion to Remand to May 30, 2014 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/25/2014. Motion Hearing currently set for 5/16/2014 is CONTINUED to 5/30/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.(Martinez, A)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Correcting Order Relating Actions And Reassigning Magistrate Judge (Doc. 10 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/14/2014. The March 25, 2014 order also indicated that all documents in the JK Case should be filed under th e case number assigned to the CVIN case. The latter instruction was issued in error. Unless and until this case is formally consolidated with the CVIN case, filings in the JK Case should be filed under the case number indicated in the caption above: 1:14-cv-0390-LJO-GSA.(Fahrney, E)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Relate Actions and to Reassign Magistrate Judge; New case number is: 1:14-cv-00390 LJO GSA; Related to 1:14-cv-00288 LJO GSA, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/25/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JK Communications & Construction, Inc. v. MP Nexlevel of CA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Steven M. Cvitanovic
Represented By: Jessica M. Lassere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MP Nexlevel of CA, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica M. Lassere
Represented By: Steven M. Cvitanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVIN, LLC
Represented By: David John Weiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JK Communications & Construction, Inc.
Represented By: David Kevin Shipp
Represented By: Joseph C McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Steven M. Cvitanovic
Represented By: Jessica M. Lassere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: MP Nexlevel of CA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cvitanovic
Represented By: Jessica M. Lassere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CVIN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Steven M. Cvitanovic
Represented By: Jessica M. Lassere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MP Nexlevel of CA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cvitanovic
Represented By: Jessica M. Lassere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: JK Communications & Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C McGowan
Represented By: David Kevin Shipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?