Sims v. Wegman et al

Plaintiff: Quincy Sims
Defendant: C. Wegman, C. Bowman, M. Searman and C. Hammond
Case Number: 1:2014cv00415
Filed: March 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss this Action Consistent with Magistrate Judge's Prior Orders signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/16/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 5/11/2018. (Flores, E)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING Case Without Prejudice and Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/5/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Third party Subpoena, Dismissing Defendant C. Bowman, Granting Plaintiff Leave to Amend, and Directing Clerk of Court to Send Plaintiff a Copy of Screening Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/02/2017. (Flores, E)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion Directing Service on the Pentagon 23 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/15/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Respond Regarding Defendant Bowman, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/23/17. 30-Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why Case Should not be Dismissed without Prejudice for Plaintiff's Failure to Effect Service signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/22/016. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2016.(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Wegman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Wegman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Searman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?