Torres v. Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Juan Matias Torres
Defendant: Ralph M. Diaz, Michael Harris, Romulo Garza, Bejarano, Edgar Aguayo, Christopher Cosello, Michelle Lefler, Abram Maylin, J. Davis and S. Marsh
Case Number: 1:2014cv00492
Filed: April 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Seal Response Filed by Defendants on June 26, 2017, and Order Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement Proceeds, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/30/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE REGARDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT 201 , FILED UNDER SEAL ON JUNE 2, 2017, ON DEFENDANTS AND DIRECTING A RESPONSE TO BE FILED WITHIN TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/7/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Response to Plaintiff's Letter; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Return Letter, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/04/2017. (Letter returned to Juan M. Torres)(Martin-Gill, S)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER denying 191 Third Motion for Extension of time to reply to Defendants' Discovery Requests as unnecessary signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/28/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Juan Matias Torres, CDC # T-72354 on March 24, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. to California State Prison, Corcoran, 4001 King Avenue, Corcoran, CA 93212, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/07/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 3/24/2017 at 08:30 AM at California State Prison (CSP-COR) 4001 King Avenue Corcoran, CA 93212 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/3/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 158 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint, STRIKING Third Amended Complaint from Record, DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's 160 Request to Modify Scheduling Order, and GRANTING Plaintiff Thirty Days to File Third Amended Complaint, if so Desired signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 131 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/15/16. (Marrujo, C)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER ADOPTING In Part Findings and Recommendations, GRANTING Defendant Fernandez's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings In Part and DENYING In Part, DENYING Defendants' Exhaustion-Related Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING Plaintiff' ;s Motion for Discovery and GRANTING In Part and DENYING In Part Plaintiff's Motions to Amend, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/7/16. (Docs 47 , 58 , 105 , 106 , 107 , 112 , 117 , 118 , 119 , 123 , 139 , 141 ) (Marrujo, C)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Regarding 145 Defendants' Request for Clarification and Striking Portion of May 23, 2016 Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to File a Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objections signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2016. (Jessen, A)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING 138 & 140 Plaintiff's Requests to Re-Submit Objections to Findings and Recommendations and Reply to Defendants' Response to Objections signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/23/2016. (Jessen, A)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANT FERNANDEZ'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, DEFENDANTS' EXHAUSTION-RELATED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND MOTIONS TO AMEND RE: 47 , 58 , 105 , 106 , 107 , 112 , 117 , 118 , 119 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/29/2016. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 3/7/2016.(Lundstrom, T)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING 88 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to Provide the Confidential Appeal Inquiry for In-Camera Review Within Ten (10) Days signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/30/2015. (Jessen, A)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's requests for additional discovery to oppose Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 61 ; 72 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/16/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 39 ; ORDER DENYING 38 Plaintiff's Request for Court Order to Obtain Confidential Calls During Discovery Phase of Litigation; and ORDER STRIKING 66 Prior Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/1/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 39 AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER TO OBTAIN CONFIDENTIAL CALLS DURING DISCOVERY PHASE OF LITIGATION 38 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/28/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER 50 AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PENDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS 60 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/26/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 46 Motion for leave to file a Third Amended the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/20/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING 37 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 35 Plaintiff's Motion for a Court Order to Obtain a Declaration From a Prisoner Witness signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/11/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PAGE 2 OF DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS re 48 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/7/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 41 Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time to File Objections and 40 Request for Waiver of Service Requirement signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/14/2015. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 38 Request for Court Order to Obtain Confidential Calls During Discovery Phase of Litigation signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/19/2015. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 4/23/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Court Order to Obtain a Declaration from Prisoner Witness signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/16/2015. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 4/20/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER striking 33 Reply to answer signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Comply With Any Pending Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/8/2015. (Jessen, A)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/18/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying As Moot Plaintiff's Motion For Correct Error In First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 13 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/24/2014. (Fahrney, E)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 8 Motion to File a First Amended Complaint as Unnecessary signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/18/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Matias Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph M. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romulo Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bejarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Aguayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cosello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Lefler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abram Maylin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?