Kinney v. Brazelton, et al.
Plaintiff: Dijon Kinney
Defendant: P.D. Brazelton, M.T. Dotson, R. J. Ozaes, A. Redding and S. Flores
Case Number: 1:2014cv00503
Filed: April 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DISCHARGING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Dijon Kinney, CDCR# AA-8634, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/11/17. (Marrujo, C)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate Dijon Kinney, CDCR# AA-8634, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/10/17. Settlement Conference set for 5/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Marrujo, C)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/05/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Dijon Kinney, CDCR# AA-8634, for Settlement Conference on May 11, 2017 at 11:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/11/2017. (Flores, E)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/05/2017. Settlement Conference set for 5/11/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER re Stipulation to Modify Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/13/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REGARDING Objections to Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/1/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER APPROVING Additional Redactions signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/28/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 101 Request for Additional Redactions signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER for Defendant to SHOW CAUSE Why ECF No. 100 Should Not be Stricken, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/30/17. Two Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER VACATING 70 Prior Scheduling Order; FURTHER Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/23/17. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing: May 26, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2 (AWI); Jury Trial: July 11, 2017, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2 (AWI). (Marrujo, C)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/16/2017. Twenty (20) day deadline for defendant's production of documents. (Jessen, A)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING 95 Motion to Appoint Counsel; ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL; and ORDER Directing Clerk to Send a Copy of This Order to the Litigation Coordinator at Plaintiff's Institution signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/11/2017. Douglas L. Gordon appointed for Dijon Kinney. (Jessen, A)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER STRIKING 88 Response filed by Dijon Kinney signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/2/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER requiring Defendant to file a response to 83 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME within Seven (7) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12172016. (Lundstrom, T)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/28/2016. Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference set for 1/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Sant Agata, S)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Dijon Kinney, CDCR# AA-8634 for Settlement Conference on December 5, 2016 at 9:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/04/2016. (Flores, E)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Regarding Objections to Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order 62 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/19/16: Defendant's objections are HEREBY OVERRULED. The matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for resolution of the outstanding discovery issues. (Hellings, J)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/29/2016. ( Settlement Conference set for 12/5/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ADOPTING 65 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DENYING Defendant's 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER GRANTING 47 Motion to Strike; ORDERED that Plaintiff's unauthorized surreply and Objections 44 and 45 are STRICKEN, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/22/16. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to: (1) Deny Defendant's 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; and (2) Grant Defendant's 47 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Surreply; Clerk to Terminate 39 Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/18/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 59 Motion to the Court to Respond to Plaintiff's Response, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/20/16. (Marrujo, C)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Reopen Discovery; ORDER Requiring Defendant to Submit Documents for in Camera Review; ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference on June 21, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/27/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 46 Motion to Reopen Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/23/16. (Marrujo, C)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 36 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/21/2015. Nunc Pro Tunc deadline is October 2, 2015 (Martin-Gill, S)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying Pitchess Motion (ECF No. 31 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/17/2015. (Fahrney, E)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting Motion To Modify Discovery And Scheduling Order (ECF No. 27 ), Discovery Deadline Extended To And Including July 21, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/8/2015. (Fahrney, E)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/25/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 23 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/18/2014. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney v. Brazelton, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dijon Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D. Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.T. Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. J. Ozaes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?