Nixon v. Sherman
Petitioner: Johnny Nelson Nixon
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Case Number: 1:2014cv00525
Filed: April 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel, ORDER Granting Petitioner's Second Motion For Extension Of Time To File Objections (ECF Nos. 37 and 38 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/4/2015. (Objections to F&R due by 4/6/2015) (Fahrney, E)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Respondent's 22 Motion to Dismiss the Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/05/2014. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 1/8/2015.(Flores, E)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/23/14. (Verduzco, M)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 15 Motion to Amend to Name a Proper Respondent; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Change Name of Respondent signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/09/2014. (Flores, E)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner Leave to File Motion to Amend to Name a Proper Respondent signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/21/2014. 30-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixon v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnny Nelson Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?