Garcia v. Beard et al
Plaintiff: Felipe Garcia
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard, Jerry Brown, Kim Holland, J. Hobmeier, Emerson, G. Wildey, Gaona and Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2014cv00625
Filed: April 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate Felipe Garcia on October 25, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/29/2017. (Flores, E)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Leave to take Depositions of Defendants Emerson and Hobmeier on the Issue of Exhaustion; ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's Request for Defendants Emerson and Hobmeier's Personnel Files signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/28/2017. (Flores, E)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request for Leave to take Plaintiff's Deposition on the Issue of Exhaustion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/15/2017. Deadline: 10/18/2017.(Flores, E)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER SETTING Evidentiary Hearing on Issue of Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/6/17. Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/25/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Marrujo, C)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER AMENDING 59 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations; ORDER REFERRING Matter to Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/5/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DIRECTING Defendant to Respond to Complaint Following Disposition of Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/17. Responsive Pleading Due Date: September 8, 2017. (Marrujo, C)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ADOPTING 56 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Defendants' 44 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/25/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/26/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 8/28/2017. (Flores, E)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Third Motion for Case Status and Ruling 54 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/15/17: No further status motions or submissions on this issue should be filed. (Hellings, J)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Regarding Motions for Case Status 51 , 52 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/7/17. (Hellings, J)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 38 Request to File Pre-Answer Motion for Summary Judgment; MOTION for Summary Judgment Due in Sixty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/22/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Dismissing Claims and Defendants signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/03/2016. Kim Holland; Rodriguez, Jeffrey A. Beard, Brown terminated.(Flores, E)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that this Action Proceed on 28 Plaintiff's Claims of Excessive Force and Failure to Protect and that the Remaining Claims be Dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/06/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 6/9/2016.(Flores, E)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Screening signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/18/2016. (Flores, E)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION FOR CASE STATUS 24 AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT 26 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/14/2015. (Amended Complaint due by 2/1/2016). (Lundstrom, T)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STRIKING 21 Document as Improperly Filed signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/16/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re Plaintiff's 19 Request for Status, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/23/15. (Verduzco, M)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, for Lak of Jurisdiction, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/9/15. (Marrujo, C)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 16 Motion for Telephonic Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/11/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 14 Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/25/2014. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Beard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hobmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Wildey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?